Proculo A. Cardenas, Jr. and Ligaya S. Cardenas
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00170 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/29/2018
Stipulation
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
66
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
67
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
68
06/13/2018
Generic Motion / Application
06/13/2018
Calendar Remark (Objection Withdrawn) (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
11/10/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.