Queen M Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02106 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing
05/21/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Notes Public (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
06/13/2018
Employee Income Records
26
07/17/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
07/18/2018
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Corrective Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/16/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
44
08/16/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
45
08/16/2018
Debtor Objection to Claim
60
12/27/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.