R.L. et al v. State of Alaska, Division of Senior and Disabilities Services et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
05/18/2018
Answer to Complaint
11
05/21/2018
Order
12
05/24/2018
Notice of Appearance
13
05/24/2018
Notice of Service List
14
05/25/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
15
05/30/2018
Amended Answer to Complaint
16
05/31/2018
Stipulation
17
06/04/2018
Notice (Other)
18
06/05/2018
Order on Stipulation
19
06/06/2018
Notice (Other)
20
06/07/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
21
07/09/2018
Settlement Agreement
22
07/10/2018
Order Dismissing Case
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.