RICKY GOODWIN
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81574 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/26/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
doc
05/27/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/28/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
doc
05/28/2018
Employee Income Records
06/30/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
09/26/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 or 11 Indiv.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.