Rachel Christina Schneider
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00138 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
13
06/07/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
14
06/22/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
07/31/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
16
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/03/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.