Ragan Evelyn Anderson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00106 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/04/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
04/04/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
04/04/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
04/04/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
04/04/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
5
04/04/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
6
04/04/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
04/04/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
04/05/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
04/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
04/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
04/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
04/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
15
04/09/2019
Hearing
16
04/09/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
04/09/2019
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
04/09/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
05/01/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.