Ragler v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00049 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
05/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
30
05/29/2018
Memorandum
31
05/29/2018
Notice (Other)
05/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
06/06/2018
Appear
34
06/06/2018
Response to Order
35
06/06/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
36
06/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
37
07/11/2018
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Remand to State Court. All other motions are denied without prejudice to renewal in state court. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/11/18.
38
08/02/2018
Judgment
39
08/10/2018
Returned/Undeliverable Mail

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.