Randall Murphy
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81190 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
36
06/13/2018
Approving
07/03/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
10/27/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
doc
10/28/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges
70
11/01/2018
Limit Notice
71
11/02/2018
Motion to Modify Plan
78
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
79
02/11/2019
Notice of Conversion (Voluntary) to Chapter 7
02/11/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
02/11/2019
Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2
81
02/11/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
82
02/11/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs
83
02/11/2019
Statement of Intent
84
02/11/2019
Certificate of Service
02/19/2019
Order: Approving Account and Discharging Trustee(Ch13-Conversion Non-Image) FOR COURT USE ONLY (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.