Randolph D Mitchell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00179 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
06/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/12/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
4
06/12/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
06/12/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/13/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
06/14/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
06/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
06/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
06/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
06/18/2018
Schedules A-J
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/28/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
14
07/03/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
15
07/05/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
16
07/05/2018
Certificate of Service
07/05/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
08/28/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
18
08/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
08/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
09/10/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
22
09/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
09/18/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
09/18/2018
Defer Closing of Case
25
09/19/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
26
09/20/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
27
09/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
10/24/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.