Randolph et al v. Fried Stewed Nude, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2015-cv-00241 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 569 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/07/2015
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1737217, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wanda Rudolph, Dennis Dragotta.
1
Summons Fried Stewed Nude Inc
2
Summons M&M Sahawneh, LLC
3
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112171552" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112171552','57648','7','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Disclosure Statement) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2015: #
4
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112171718" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112171718','57648','7','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
4 Attachments
2
05/08/2015
Summons Issued as to Fried Stewed Nude, Inc., M & M Sahawneh, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.)
3
05/08/2015
Service Order entered 5/8/2015. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 6/22/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/8/2015.
4
05/13/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph, Dennis Dragotta. M & M Sahawneh, LLC served on 5/11/2015, answer due 6/1/2015
5
05/14/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph, Dennis Dragotta. Fried Stewed Nude, Inc. served on 5/12/2015, answer due 6/2/2015
6
06/23/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Fried Stewed Nude, Inc.
06/23/2015
MOTIONS REFERRED: 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, to Judge Steele (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/24/2015
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Plaintiffs to show cause by 6/30/2015 why they have not sought entry of default against defendant M&M Sahawneh for failure to answer. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/24/2015.
8
06/24/2015
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Fried Stewed Nude, Inc. on 7/15/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/24/2015.
9
06/30/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by William Douglas Montgomery, Jr on behalf of M & M Sahawneh, LLC
10
06/30/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Connell Heinz on behalf of M & M Sahawneh, LLC
11
06/30/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Rule 12(b) Motion by M & M Sahawneh, LLC.
06/30/2015
MOTIONS REFERRED: 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Rule 12(b) Motion to Judge Steele (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
06/30/2015
RESPONSE to 7 Order to Show Cause filed by Dennis Dragotta, Wanda Randolph.
13
06/30/2015
Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Plaintiffs' Response 12 filed by Dennis Dragotta, Wanda Randolph.
14
07/01/2015
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from M & M Sahawneh, LLC on 7/15/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/30/15.
15
07/15/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Fried Stewed Nude, Inc.
16
07/15/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by M & M Sahawneh, LLC.
17
07/15/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant M & M Sahawneh, LLC.
18
07/15/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Fried Stewed Nude, Inc.
19
07/16/2015
ORDER on 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fried Stewed Nude, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/16/2015.
20
07/16/2015
Order re: 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by M & M Sahawneh, LLC. Defendant is ordered by 7/24/2015 to file an amended Corporate Disclosure Statement disclosing all members of the LLC & the state of citizenship of each member. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/16/2015.
21
07/16/2015
Documents endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement 18 filed by Fried Stewed Nude, Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement 17 filed by M & M Sahawneh, LLC.
22
07/17/2015
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/31/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/17/2015.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112203783" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112203783','57648','68','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent Form)
1 Attachment
23
07/20/2015
Order directing each Plaintiff to answer the Court's Interrogatories by 8/20/2015. All other deadlines as set out. If settlement is not achieved within the time frame set forth herein, the Court will issue a supplemental scheduling order and set this case for trial. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/20/2015.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112204765" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112204765','57648','70','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Court's Interrogatories)
1 Attachment
24
07/23/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant M & M Sahawneh, LLC.
07/24/2015
REFERRAL OF 24 (Amended) Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
07/24/2015
Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement 24 filed by M & M Sahawneh, LLC.
26
07/24/2015
ORDER on 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by M & M Sahawneh, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/24/2015.
27
08/19/2015
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to answer the Court-ordered interrogatories by Wanda Randolph.
08/20/2015
MOTIONS REFERRED: 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to answer the Court-ordered interrogatories Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/20/2015
ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Randolph is ORDRED to file the requested interrogatories (Doc. 23-1) on or before Thursday, August 27, 2015. All other dates in the Preliminary Scheduling Order (Doc. 23) are unaffected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/20/2015.
29
08/20/2015
NOTICE by Dennis Dragotta re 23 Order, Set Deadlines, of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories
08/21/2015
REFERRAL OF 29 Notice of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/26/2015
NOTICE by Wanda Randolph re 23 Order, Set Deadlines, of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories
08/27/2015
REFERRAL OF 30 Notice of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
09/25/2015
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Fried Stewed Nude, Inc.
09/25/2015
REFERRAL OF 31 Notice of Settlement to Judge Steele. (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
09/25/2015
Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/25/2015.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.