Randolph et al v. Rouse Properties, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

1:2015-cv-00460 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 485 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/18/2015
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1798245, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wanda Randolph, Dennis Dragotta.
1
Exhibit Rouse Summons
2
Exhibit RPI Summons
3
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112232613" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112232613','58248','9','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Exhibit Disclosure Statement) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2015: #
4
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112233074" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112233074','58248','9','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
4 Attachments
2
09/21/2015
Summons Issued as to RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.)
3
09/21/2015
Service Notice entered 9/21/2015. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 11/2/2015.
4
09/24/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph, Dennis Dragotta. Rouse Properties, Inc. served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015
5
09/24/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph, Dennis Dragotta. RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015
6
10/12/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.
7
10/12/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas L. Anderson on behalf of RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.
8
10/12/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Gillian G. Watson Egan on behalf of RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.
9
10/13/2015
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/26/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 10/13/2015. (Attachment: # 1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge)
10
10/13/2015
Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendants RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.; Disclosure Statements Due 10/19/2015.
11
10/19/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Rouse Properties, Inc., Brookfield Asset Management, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Brookfield Asset Management, Inc. for Rouse Properties, Inc.
12
10/19/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, LP identifying Other Affiliate Rouse Properties, LP for RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC.
13
10/19/2015
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement 12 filed by RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement 11 filed by Rouse Properties, Inc.
14
10/20/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc., Rouse Properties, LP, Rouse GP, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Rouse Properties, Inc., Other Affiliate Rouse Properties, LP, Other Affiliate Rouse GP, LLC for RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC.
15
10/20/2015
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement, 14 filed by RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC
16
10/21/2015
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: 14 Supplemental Disclosure Statement filed by RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC
17
10/30/2015
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Dennis Dragotta by Dennis Dragotta.
11/02/2015
REFERRAL OF 17 Suggestion of Death of Plf Dennis Dragotta to Judge Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/02/2015
Order re: 17 Suggestion of Death as to Dennis Dragotta, unless Plfs file a motion to substitute the estate of Dennis Dragotta on or before 1/28/2016, Plf Dragotta's claims against Dfts will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/2/2015.
19
11/10/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by H. William Wasden on behalf of RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc. (Wasden, H.)
20
11/25/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wasden, H.)
11/25/2015
REFERRAL OF 20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Milling. (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
11/30/2015
NOTICE of Endorsement by Wanda Randolph re: 20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
22
11/30/2015
Order, provisions of FRCP 26(a)(1) concerning initial disclosures are WAIVED. NLT 12/18/2015, Plf shall answer, serve & file Court's Interrogatories as set out. NLT 1/29/2016, Dfts shall permit inspection of facility as set out. NLT 2/19/2016, Plfs shall provide Dfts w/copy of expert report as set out. NLT 4/1/2016, Dft shall serve written response as set out. NLT 4/13/2016, parties shall mediate this dispute as set out. Parties shall notify the Court within 7 days after the mediation conference as to whether a settlement was reached. All discovery in this case is STAYED until further order of this Court as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 11/30/2015. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A-Court's Interrogatories)
11/30/2015
REFERRAL OF 21 Notice of Endorsement to Judge Milling. (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
12/18/2015
NOTICE by Wanda Randolph re 22 Order, Set Deadlines, of Filing Court Interrogatories
24
12/23/2015
MOTION for Gillian G. W. Egan to Withdraw as Attorney by RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.
25
12/28/2015
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gillian G. Watson Egan terminated. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/28/2015.
01/06/2016
REFERRAL OF 23 Notice of Filing Answer to Court's Interrogatories to Judge Milling. (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/08/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Lynes Scully on behalf of RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.
27
02/05/2016
ORDER, there having been no substitution of parties filed as directed in the Court's 18 Order, Plf Dennis Dragotta's claims against Dfts are DISMISSED as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/5/2016.
28
02/08/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time by Wanda Randolph.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
02/10/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Report referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/10/2016
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER, 28 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is GRANTED as set out. Provisions of FRCP 26(a)(1) concerning initial disclosures are WAIVED. NLT 12/18/2015, Plf shall answer, serve & file Court's Interrogatories as set out. NLT 1/29/2016, Dfts shall permit inspection of facility as set out. NLT 3/18/2016, Plfs shall provide Dfts w/copy of expert report as set out. NLT 4/29/2016, Dft shall serve written response as set out. NLT 5/11/2016, parties shall mediate this dispute as set out. Parties shall notify the Court within 7 days after the mediation conference as to whether a settlement was reached. All discovery in this case is STAYED until further order of this Court as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 2/10/2016. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A-Court's Interrogatories)
30
04/18/2016
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.
1
Text of Proposed Order (proposed 2nd Amended Scheduling Order)
1 Attachment
04/18/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
04/20/2016
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dfts' 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time is GRANTED. 29 Amended Scheduling Order is amended as set out. NLT 5/30/2016, Dft shall serve a written response, including any Rule 26(a)(2) expert report, that Dfts intend to rely upon. NLT 6/30/2016, parties shall mediate this dispute as set out. Parties shall notify the Court within 7 days after the mediation conference as to whether a settlement was reached. All other discovery in this case is STAYED until further order of this Court as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 4/20/2016.
32
05/31/2016
Notice of Filing Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure and Defendants' Disclosures under FRCP 26(a)(2)(B) filed by RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.
33
06/29/2016
Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference by RPI Bell Air Mall, LLC, Rouse Properties, Inc.
06/30/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 33 Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/07/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 7/7/2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
07/07/2016
ORDER, 33 Joint Motion for Settlement Conference is MOOT as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 7/7/2016.
35
07/07/2016
ORDER, all claims in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of any party to reinstate those claims within 30 days of the date of this order should the settlement not be consummated. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/7/2016.
36
08/05/2016
MOTION to Reopen Case by Wanda Randolph. Added Alternative MOTION for Extension of Time to file reinstatement on 8/5/2016
08/05/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 36 MOTION to Reopen Case or, Alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reinstatement; Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
08/09/2016
ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING 36 alternative motion for extension of time to file reinstatement. The deadline for any party to move to reinstate the claims in this action should settlement not be consummated is extended to September 6, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/9/2016.
38
09/06/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to Reinstate Claims by Wanda Randolph.
09/07/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reinstate Claims Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
09/07/2016
ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING 38 Final Motion for a Seven Day Extension of Time to Reinstate Claims. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/7/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.