Randolph et al v. jl Holdings i, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

1:2015-cv-00344 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/06/2015
COMPLAINT against JL Holdings I, LLC, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1763296, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wanda Randolph, Dennis Dragotta.
1
Disclosure Statement
2
Summons
3
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112197889" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112197889','57913','7','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Summons) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2015: #
4
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112198719" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112198719','57913','7','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
4 Attachments
2
07/08/2015
Summons Issued as to JL Holdings I, LLC, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.)
3
07/08/2015
Service Order entered 7/8/2015. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 8/20/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/8/2015.
4
07/15/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph, Dennis Dragotta. JL Holdings I, LLC served on 7/10/2015, answer due 7/31/2015
5
07/15/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph, Dennis Dragotta. Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC served on 7/10/2015, answer due 7/31/2015
6
07/23/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by H. William Wasden on behalf of Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC (Wasden, H.)
7
07/23/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Kavanagh, Jr on behalf of Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC
8
07/29/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by H. William Wasden on behalf of JL Holdings I, LLC (Wasden, H.)
9
07/29/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Kavanagh, Jr on behalf of JL Holdings I, LLC
10
07/31/2015
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by JL Holdings I, LLC, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC. (Wasden, H.)
07/31/2015
MOTIONS REFERRED: 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Judge Steele (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
07/31/2015
Order granting 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file an answer. Answer due from JL Holdings I, LLC on 8/10/2015; Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC on 8/10/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/31/2015.
12
08/03/2015
Order (docket text only): Defendants JL Holdings I, LLC and Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC shall file disclosure statements in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than 8/10/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/3/2015.
13
08/10/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC. (Wasden, H.)
14
08/10/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant JL Holdings I, LLC. (Wasden, H.)
15
08/10/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC. (Wasden, H.)
16
08/10/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by JL Holdings I, LLC. (Wasden, H.)
17
08/10/2015
Documents endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement 14 filed by JL Holdings I, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement 13 filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC.
18
08/11/2015
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/25/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/11/2015.
1
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112214072" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112214072','57913','57','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Consent Form)
1 Attachment
19
08/11/2015
ORDER on 14, 13 Disclosure Statements filed by JL Holdings I, LLC, filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/11/2015.
20
08/12/2015
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER FOR ADA CASES: The Preliminary Scheduling order (Doc. 18) is vacated. The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) concerning initial disclosures are WAIVED. Answer to interrogatories are due by 9/10/2015. Position Regarding Settlement is due by 1/20/2016. Until further order of Court, all discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/12/2015.
21
09/10/2015
NOTICE by Dennis Dragotta re 20 Order, Set Deadlines, of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories
22
09/10/2015
NOTICE by Wanda Randolph re 20 Order, Set Deadlines, of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories
23
09/14/2015
Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order 20 Order, Set Deadlines, by JL Holdings I, LLC, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC.
09/14/2015
MOTIONS REFERRED: 23 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order 20 Order, Set Deadlines - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
09/15/2015
AMENDED PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER FOR ADA CASES: The 23 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order is granted. Settlement Position due by 2/3/2016. All other deadlines as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/15/2015.
25
10/30/2015
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Dennis Dragotta by Dennis Dragotta.
10/30/2015
REFERRAL OF 25 Suggestion of Death to Judge Steele. (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
11/10/2015
MOTION to Dismiss by Wanda Randolph.
27
11/10/2015
NOTICE by Dennis Dragotta of Intent to Terminate Litigation
11/12/2015
MOTIONS REFERRED: 26 MOTION to Dismiss & 27 Notice of Intent to Terminate Litigation to Judge Steele (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/12/2015
Order re: 27 Notice of intent to terminate litigation filed by Dennis Dragotta. Dragotta is ordered by 12/3/2015 to file a statement from an authorized representative as set out. Responses to the 26 Motion to Dismiss are due by 12/10/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/12/2015.
29
12/03/2015
AFFIDAVIT re 28 Order, Set Deadlines, of Sherry Dragotta by Dennis Dragotta.
12/03/2015
REFERRAL OF 29 Affidavit to Judge Steele. (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
12/10/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re: 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JL Holdings I, LLC, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company LLC. (Wasden, H.)
12/10/2015
REFERRAL OF 30 Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
12/22/2015
ORDER granting in part 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wanda Randolph. This action as to Ms. Randolph is dismissed with prejudice. To the extent it seeks dismissal of the action as to Mr. Dragotta, the motion isdenied. This action as to Mr. Dragotta is stayed (other than for purposes of filing a motion for substitution) until further order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/22/2015.
32
02/10/2016
Order re: 25 Suggestion of Death filed by Dennis Dragotta. No motion for substitution has been filejd. This action is dismissed as to Dennis Dragotta. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/10/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.