Randolph v. Dillards Department Stores, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2016-cv-00139 (alsd)

NOTICE of Settlement by Wanda Randolph

Case 1:16-cv-00139-C Document 18 Filed 08/22/16 Page 1 of 2 IN THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION) WANDA RANDOLPH,) Plaintiff,) CIVIL ACTION NO.) v.) 1:16-cv-00139-C DILLARD’S INC., HIGBEE SALVA) LP, and THE HIGBEE COMPANY,)) Defendants.)) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT COMES NOW the Plaintiff, Wanda Randolph, hereinafter ("Plaintiff") by and through her undersigned counsel, and hereby notifies the Court of the settlement of this matter. The Parties are working to finalize a written settlement agreement and believe the settlement can be finalized within 60 days. Respectfully Submitted, this the 22nd Day of August, 2016./s/L. Landis Sexton L. LANDIS SEXTON BPR # AL-5057N71L The ADA Group LLC 2047 Carter Hill Road Montgomery, Alabama 36106 334.819.4030 p 334.819.4032 f LLS@ADA-Firm.com Attorney for the Plaintiff [1] Case 1:16-cv-00139-C Document 18 Filed 08/22/16 Page 2 of 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE This is to certify that I have this day filed with the Clerk of Court the aforementioned document for service of process by USPS mail or electronic mail, postage prepaid and properly addressed this 22nd day of August, 2016 to the following: Matthew Tae Phillips Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. 420 20th Street North, Suite 1900 Birmingham, AL 35203 205-714-4409 Email: tae.phillips@ogletreedeakins.com/s/L. Landis Sexton L. LANDIS SEXTON BPR # AL-5057N71L The ADA Group LLC 2047 Carter Hill Road Montgomery, Alabama 36106 334.819.4030 p 334.819.4032 f LLS@ADA-Firm.com Attorney for the Plaintiff [2]

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/01/2016
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1879723, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wanda Randolph.
1
Exhibit Disclosure Statement
2
Exhibit Summons Dillard's
3
Exhibit Summons The Higbee Company
4
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112314803" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112314803','59090','7','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Exhibit Summons Higbee Salva) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2016: #
5
https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02112315155" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02112315155','59090','7','','2','1','',''}};">5</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
5 Attachments
2
04/04/2016
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial.
3
04/04/2016
Summons Issued as to Dillards Department Stores, Inc., Higbee Salva, LP, The Higbee Company, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.
4
04/11/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph. Higbee Salva, LP served on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016
5
04/11/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph. The Higbee Company, Inc. served on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016
6
04/14/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph. Dillards Department Stores, Inc. served on 4/11/2016, answer due 5/2/2016
7
04/15/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time by Wanda Randolph.
8
04/22/2016
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for any defendant that has already been served in this matter to file its answer or other responsive pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) is hereby extended by 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/22/2016.
04/22/2016
Answer due from Dillards Department Stores, Inc. on 5/15/2016; Higbee Salva, LP on 5/15/2016; The Higbee Company, Inc. on 5/15/2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
05/24/2016
Second MOTION for Extension of Time by Wanda Randolph.
10
05/31/2016
Order re: 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Wanda Randolph, (Supplement deadline set for 6/7/2016.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/31/2016.
11
06/03/2016
NOTICE by Wanda Randolph re 10 Order, Set Deadlines PROOF OF SERVICE AND NOTICE OF SERVICE ATTEMPT
12
06/03/2016
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Higbee Salva, LP, The Higbee Company, Inc., Dillard's Inc., filed by Wanda Randolph.
13
06/03/2016
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Steven Duke on 06/03/2016 by Wanda Randolph. Waiver of Service due by 7/3/2016.
14
06/06/2016
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph. Dillard's Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2016, answer due 8/2/2016; Higbee Salva, LP waiver sent on 6/3/2016, answer due 8/2/2016; The Higbee Company, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2016, answer due 8/2/2016.
15
06/13/2016
ORDER entered. Denied as moot 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/13/2016.
16
08/01/2016
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 12 Amended Complaint by Dillard's Inc., Dillards Department Stores, Inc., Higbee Salva, LP, The Higbee Company, Inc.
17
08/03/2016
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; re 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 12 Amended Complaint. Answer due from Dillard's Inc. on 8/23/2016; Dillards Department Stores, Inc. on 8/23/2016; Higbee Salva, LP on 8/23/2016; The Higbee Company, Inc. on 8/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/3/2016.
18
08/22/2016
NOTICE of Settlement by Wanda Randolph
19
08/24/2016
Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 60 days should the settlement not be consummated. Provided no party reinstates this action, final judgment, as prescribed by Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, shall be deemed as entered on October 23, 2016. The parties are to bear their own costs, unless otherwise agreed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/24/2016.
20
10/24/2016
FINAL JUDGMENT entered. See Doc. 19. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/24/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.