Randolph v. Midwest Hospitality, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2015-cv-00562 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 609 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/02/2015
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1819618, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Wanda Randolph.
1
Disclosure Statement
2
Summons_Cajun
3
Summons_Hospitality
3 Attachments
2
11/04/2015
Summons Issued as to Cajun Operating Company, Midwest Hospitality, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.)
3
11/04/2015
Service Notice entered 11/4/2015. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/17/2015.
4
11/06/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph. Midwest Hospitality, LLC served on 11/5/2015, answer due 11/26/2015
5
11/06/2015
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Randolph. Cajun Operating Company served on 11/5/2015, answer due 11/26/2015
6
11/25/2015
ANSWER to Complaint by Cajun Operating Company.
7
11/25/2015
ANSWER to Complaint by Midwest Hospitality, LLC.
8
11/25/2015
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/25/2015. (Attachment: # 1 consent form)
9
11/25/2015
Copy of Disclosure Statement form e-mailed to Defendants Cajun Operating Company, Midwest Hospitality, LLC; Disclosure Statements Due 12/2/2015.
10
12/02/2015
Order, Dfts Midwest Hospitality, LLC & Cajun Operating Company are to file their disclosure statements on or before 12/9/2015 as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/2/2015. (Attachment: # 1 Blank Disclosure Statement Form)
11
12/09/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cajun Operating Company.
12
12/09/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Midwest Hospitality, LLC.
13
12/09/2015
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement 11 filed by Cajun Operating Company
14
12/15/2015
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Midwest Hospitality, LLC.
15
12/16/2015
Order, VACATING 8 Preliminary Scheduling Order, and STAYING discovery. Plaintiff's answer to Court's Interrogatories (Exhibit A) due 1/11/2016. Defendants shall permit Plaintiff's counsel and expert reasonable access to inspect facility within 30 days from Defendants' receipt of Plaintiff's Interrogatory responses. Plaintiff's expert's report due 45 days after inspection of facility. Defendants' written response to expert's report due 30 days after receipt of report. Parties are to either mediate dispute, or file a request for a settlement conference with the Court 30 days after submission of Defendants' written response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/16/2015.
16
12/17/2015
Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement 11 filed by Cajun Operating Company, and Corporate Disclosure Statement 14 filed by Midwest Hospitality, LLC.
17
12/30/2015
Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement 14 filed by Midwest Hospitality, LLC
18
01/11/2016
NOTICE by Wanda Randolph re 15 Order, Terminate Deadlines, Set Deadlines, Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories
01/12/2016
REFERRAL OF 18 Answers to Interrogatories to Judge Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
05/04/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Complete Response to Plaintiff's Inspection Report and Mediate Plaintiff's Claims by Cajun Operating Company, Midwest Hospitality, LLC.
05/04/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 19 MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Complete Response to Plaintiff's Inspection Report and Mediate Plaintiff's Claims Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
05/27/2016
MOTION for Settlement Conference by Wanda Randolph.
05/27/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 20 MOTION for Settlement Conference Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/03/2016
NOTICE of Hearing on Motions 19 MOTION for Extension of Time & 20 MOTION for Settlement Conference: Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2016 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Email to be sent to parties.
06/09/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2016. DCR Digital Audio Recording. Order to follow. (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
06/09/2016
ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot 19 Motion for Extension of Time & granting 20 Motion for Settlement Conference. Parties are to file a Joint Status Report NLT 6/30/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/9/2016. Copies to parties.
24
06/28/2016
STATUS REPORT - Joint - Regarding Resolution Efforts by Cajun Operating Company, Midwest Hospitality, LLC.
25
06/30/2016
Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Status Report 24 filed by Midwest Hospitality, LLC, Cajun Operating Company
06/30/2016
REFERRAL OF 24 Joint Status Report re: Settlement to Judge Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/01/2016
Order, setting status conference via telephone for 8/2/2016 at 10:00 AM Chambers staff will provide call in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/1/2016.
08/02/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/2/2016. Court will set a settlement conf. for 8/18/16 @ 9:30 AM - Order to follow. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/02/2016
Order, Settlement Conference set for 8/18/2016 at 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Counsel for each party is to submit a confidential settlement statement in chambers by 5:00 PM on 8/15/16 as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/2/2016.
29
08/17/2016
Order re: 28 Order Set Hearings - The Court has been notified by the Defendants that the case has settled, and therefore, the settlement conference is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/17/2016. Copies to parties.
30
09/26/2016
Order, the parties are to file a joint stipulation of dismissal, or file a written status of the case, on or before 10/3/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/26/2016.
31
09/30/2016
STATUS REPORT REGARDING SETLEMENT by Midwest Hospitality, LLC, Cajun Operating Company.
09/30/2016
REFERRAL OF 31 Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement to Judge Granade & Judge Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/03/2016
NOTICE of Endorsement by Wanda Randolph re: 31 Status Report
33
10/03/2016
NOTICE of Endorsement by Wanda Randolph re: 31 Status Report
10/04/2016
REFERRAL OF 32 Notice of Endorsement, 33 Notice of Endorsement to Judge Granade & Judge Bivins. (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
10/31/2016
Order re: 31 Status Report. Parties are to either file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or file a written notice advising the Court of the status of the case, on or before 11/7/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/31/2016.
35
11/01/2016
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Midwest Hospitality, LLC.
11/01/2016
REFERRAL OF 35 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
11/02/2016
Order re: 35 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Unless Dfts file an objection on or before 11/9/2016, this action will be deemed DISMISSED w/prejudice, w/each party to bear her/its own costs, without further order from the Court as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/2/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.