Randy L Jaques
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00262 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/10/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
08/10/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
08/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
08/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
08/16/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.