Randy Nathaniel Moon
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01452 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 168 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/04/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Randy Nathaniel Moon (Shinn, J.)
2
04/04/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon. (Shinn, J.)
4
04/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon. (Shinn, J.)
5
04/04/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon. (Shinn, J.)
6
04/04/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/09/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/01/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/09/2018.
04/04/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01452-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21917098. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/04/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon. (Shinn, J.)
8
04/05/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/05/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon Case Number 91-00888, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/01/1991, Standard Discharge on 05/15/1991; Case Number 91-06342, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/22/1991, Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/25/1994; Case Number 94-01765, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/25/1994, Standard Discharge on 05/28/1999; Case Number 04-53477, Chapter 7 filed in Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court on 07/12/2004, Standard Discharge on 02/05/2009; Case Number 89-07011, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/19/1989, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/23/1991.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/06/2018.
10
04/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/07/2018.
11
04/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon). Notice Date 04/07/2018.
12
05/01/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor United Consumer Fiancial Serv.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
13
05/04/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
14
05/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 05/09/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
15
05/14/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
16
05/15/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
17
05/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/17/2018.
18
06/14/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for for Individual, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule A/B: Property for Individual, Amended Schedule C Filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon. (Shinn, J.)
19
06/14/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
20
06/15/2018
Objection to Claim # 9 of United Consumer Financial Services in the amount of $1,044.96 Filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon. (Shinn, J.)
21
06/15/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 20 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Randy Nathaniel Moon). Hearing scheduled 7/31/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
22
06/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/17/2018.
23
06/19/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/19/2018 (RE: related document(s) 6 Confirmation Hearing, 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/31/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/21/2018.
25
07/31/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/31/2018 (RE: related document(s) 6 Confirmation Hearing, 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 9/11/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
27
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 08/02/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.