Randy William Beck
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00320 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/26/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
09/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
09/26/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
09/26/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/27/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
09/27/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
9
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
10/01/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
14
10/05/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
10/16/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/15/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
12/13/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
12/13/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
12/26/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
01/09/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/09/2019
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
21
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
01/28/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
23
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/31/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.