Raymond Gene LeGrue and Sharon Rene LeGrue
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00373 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
45
08/02/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
46
11/21/2018
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
47
12/05/2018
Entry of Appearance
48
12/05/2018
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
49
12/20/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
50
12/20/2018
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge
51
01/24/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
52
01/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/28/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.