Raynada Nicole Moss
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01709 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 242 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/20/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Raynada Nicole Moss (Shinn, J.)
2
04/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss. (Shinn, J.)
3
04/20/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss (Shinn, J.)
5
04/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss. (Shinn, J.)
6
04/20/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss. (Shinn, J.)
7
04/20/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss. (Shinn, J.)
8
04/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/29/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/17/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/30/2018.
9
04/20/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss. (Shinn, J.)
10
04/21/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
11
04/21/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
12
04/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/22/2018.
04/23/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Raynada Nicole Moss Case Number 03-08283, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/19/2003, Standard Discharge on 03/09/2007; Case Number 12-05962, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/21/2012, Standard Discharge on 04/01/2013.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
04/23/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss).
14
04/25/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
16
04/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss). Notice Date 04/25/2018.
17
05/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/30/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
18
06/04/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
19
06/04/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
06/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/06/2018.
06/12/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 156.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-01709-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (156.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22167693. Fee Amount 156.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/09/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amended Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss. (Shinn, J.)
22
07/11/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Raynada Nicole Moss. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
23
07/12/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/12/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/7/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
07/12/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 78.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-01709-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (78.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22274684. Fee Amount 78.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/14/2018.
08/08/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 76.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/09/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s)[13] Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.