Rebekah Kathleen Lellig
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00023 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/25/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
01/25/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/25/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/25/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/26/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
01/28/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
01/28/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
5
01/28/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
01/28/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
7
01/30/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
8
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
02/08/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
12
02/08/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
13
02/11/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
14
02/14/2019
Notice of Non-Compliance (LBF37)
02/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
02/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
02/20/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
17
02/20/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
03/01/2019
Notice of Presumed Abuse (BNC Notice)
20
03/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Clerks Notice of Presumed Abuse
21
03/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse
03/05/2019
Statement of Declination (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
03/06/2019
Show Cause (with hrg) (SA)
23
03/07/2019
Amended Order (SA)
24
03/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
03/11/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
27
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
28
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
29
03/18/2019
Comply (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.