Reeves, et al v. Bayer ag, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2002-cv-01402 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 567 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/20/2002
DEMAND for jury trial by Frances D. Reeves, Patricia Harrison, Oscar Ivey
2
12/20/2002
ANSWER to Complaint by Bayer Corporation; jury demand; referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
01/07/2003
NOTICE of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Frances D. Reeves, Patricia Harrison, Oscar Ivey, Bayer Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline plc. (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2003
CASE reassigned to Judge Myron H. Thompson (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2003
REFERRAL JUDGE assigned to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/15/2003
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 1/31/03 for Tri-Med Center, for James O. Colley III, for GlaxoSmithKline plc, for Bayer Pharmaceutical, for Bayer Corporation, for Bayer AG, for Oscar Ivey, for Patricia Harrison, for Frances D. Reeves to show cause why this cause should not be stayed pending transfer as an MDL case (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
5
01/17/2003
BRIEF by Frances D. Reeves, Patricia Harrison, Oscar Ivey in support of [4-1] motion to Remand, and [4-2] motion for Leave to Amend [1-1] complaint (w/exhibit A); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
6
01/22/2003
ORDER setting [4-1] motion to Remand by Oscar Ivey, Patricia Harrison, Frances D. Reeves, and [4-2] motion for Leave to Amend [1-1] complaint by Oscar Ivey, Patricia Harrison, Frances D. Reeves for submission on 1/31/03, with all briefs due by said date (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
7
01/31/2003
OPPOSITION by Bayer Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline plc to [4-1] motion to Remand by Oscar Ivey, Patricia Harrison, Frances D. Reeves, and [4-2] motion for Leave to Amend [1-1] complaint by Oscar Ivey, Patricia Harrison, Frances D. Reeves (w/exhibits A-L); referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
8
02/07/2003
ORDER: The court being of the opinion that all pending matters should be left for resolution after MDL transfer, it is ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are stayed pending MDL transfer; staying [4-1] motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Bullock County and [4-2] motion for Leave to Amend [1-1] complaint (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel. (dkt clerk)
9
02/21/2003
(Notice) MOTION by Frances D. Reeves, Patricia Harrison, Oscar Ivey for Martin E. Willoughby to Withdraw as Attorney and Continuation of Representation; referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
10
02/25/2003
ORDER granting [9-1] motion for Martin E. Willoughby to Withdraw as Attorney (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies provided to counsel.
11
03/12/2003
Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer ORDER entered 02/26/03 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to the USDC, District of Minnesota
03/12/2003
Interdistrict transfer to District of Minnesota (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2003
Entire file with certified copy of docket entries mailed to USDC, District of Minnesota (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.