Reginald Earl Ware
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2015-bk-04145 (alnb)

Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Tom Tutten to submit a separate order.) RE: Doc #59; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr., Attorney for The Bank of New York Mellon

15-04145-TOM13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Reginald Earl Ware } Case No: 15-04145-TOM13 SSN: XXX-XX-7075 } DEBTOR(S). } } } COURTROOM DEPUTY NOTES Matter(s): RE: Doc #59; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr., Attorney for The Bank of New York Mellon Date and Time: Thursday, January 25, 2018 10:00 AM Appearances: The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Trustee For CIT Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc., F/K/A Vericrest Financial, Inc., as its attorney in fact Bradford W. Botes attorney for Reginald Earl Ware (Debtor) Bradford W. Caraway (Trustee) Courtroom Deputy: Chris Callies Presiding Judge: TAMARA O. MITCHELL Court Notes: Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Tom Tutten to submit a separate order. Date Prepared:01/24/2018 Case 15-04145-TOM13 Doc 66 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 14:42:01 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/13/2015
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Reginald Earl Ware
3
10/13/2015
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
4
10/13/2015
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
10/13/2015
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(15-04145-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18585631. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/13/2015
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
6
10/13/2015
Tax Documents for the Year for 2014 Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
7
10/13/2015
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
8
10/14/2015
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10/14/2015
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Reginald Earl Ware Case Number 98-02897, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/01/1998, Standard Discharge on 12/28/2001.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
10/13/2015
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/18/2015 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/17/2015 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 02/16/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 04/11/2016 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/19/2016.
10
10/14/2015
Composition Letter (pro rata)
11
10/15/2015
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
12
10/16/2015
Amended Schedules. Fee Amount $30 Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
10/16/2015
Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee)(15-04145-TOM13) [misc,amdsch2] (30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18599834. Fee Amount 30.00 (re:Doc# 12) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/16/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 10/16/2015.
14
10/16/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Letter). Notice Date 10/16/2015.
15
10/16/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware). Notice Date 10/16/2015.
16
10/16/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/16/2015.
17
10/20/2015
Notice of Amendment to Schedules adding Amsher Collections, St. Vincent's Birmingham, Alabama Heart & Vascular PC, Seal Harris Clinic PC, Alabama Digestive Health & Endos, Bham Pulmonary Group PC, Medical Fin. Sol. St. Vincent's, HFC, Capital One, Chase, First National Bank of Omaha, Advanta Credit Card, Wells Fargo, Bank of America, Washington Mutual/Providian, Direct Merchant, Compass Visa and Washington Mutual. (RE: related document(s) 12 Amended Schedules (Fee) filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware).
18
10/20/2015
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Bradford W. Botes, has failed to amend the summary of schedules and statistical summary when filing the Amended Schedules. SOLUTION: The filer, Bradford W. Botes, should amend the summary of schedules and statistical summary when filing the Amended Schedules. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 12 Amended Schedules (Fee) filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware).
19
10/21/2015
Summary of Schedules, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
20
10/22/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Amendment to Schedules (prior to confirmation)). Notice Date 10/22/2015.
21
10/23/2015
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.
22
11/19/2015
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/18/2015.
23
11/20/2015
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.
24
11/20/2015
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/17/2015 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
25
11/22/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/22/2015.
26
11/24/2015
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
27
12/09/2015
Debtor's Objection to Claim 1 of creditor Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $16,501.22 Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
28
12/10/2015
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 27 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware). Hearing scheduled 1/14/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
29
12/12/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/12/2015.
30
12/17/2015
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/17/2015 11:08:17 AM ]. File Size [ 441 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:13 ]. (RE: Doc #23; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
31
12/22/2015
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/21/2015 (RE: related document(s) 9 Confirmation), 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 27 Objection to Claim #1 filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware). Hearing rescheduled to 1/28/2016 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
32
12/24/2015
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Notice and Order). Notice Date 12/24/2015.
33
01/22/2016
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
34
01/27/2016
Second Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
35
01/28/2016
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 1/28/2016 (RE: related document(s) 9 Confirmation Hearing, 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 27 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware). Hearing scheduled 2/4/2016 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
36
01/29/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/28/2016 11:45:17 AM ]. File Size [ 657 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:49 ]. (RE: Doc #27; Debtor's Objection to Claim #1 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $16,501.22). (adiuser).
37
01/31/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/31/2016.
38
02/03/2016
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 1 Signed on 2/3/2016 (RE: related document(s) 27 Debtor's Objection to Claim 1 of creditor Internal Revenue Service withdrawn).
39
02/03/2016
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/3/2016 (RE: related document(s) 9 Confirmation Hearing, 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/10/2016 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
40
02/05/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 02/05/2016.
41
02/05/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 39 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/05/2016.
42
02/08/2016
Amended Schedule C, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware.
43
02/08/2016
Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware
44
02/08/2016
Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien Filed by Debtor Reginald Earl Ware
45
03/09/2016
Order Granting Motion To Avoid Judicial Lien (Related Doc # 43) Signed on 3/9/2016.
46
03/09/2016
Order Granting Motion To Avoid Judicial Lien (Related Doc # 44) Signed on 3/9/2016.
47
03/11/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/10/2016 11:54:03 AM ]. File Size [ 203 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:34 ]. (RE: Doc #23; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
48
03/11/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 45 Order on Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien). Notice Date 03/11/2016.
49
03/11/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Order on Motion to Avoid Judicial Lien). Notice Date 03/11/2016.
50
03/14/2016
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
51
03/24/2016
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed on 3/24/2016 (RE: related document(s) 23 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss).
52
03/26/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 51 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 03/26/2016.
53
05/18/2016
Trustee's Objection to Claim 1 of creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE in the amount of $0.00 Filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford.
54
05/18/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 53 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford). Hearing scheduled 6/30/2016 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
55
05/20/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 54 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/20/2016.
56
06/14/2016
Trustee's Withdrawal Filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford (RE: related document(s) 53 Trustee's Objection to Claim 1 of creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE in the amount of $0.00 Filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford. filed by Trustee D. Sims Crawford).
57
06/14/2016
Order Withdrawing Trustee's Objection to Claim #1 Signed on 6/14/2016 (RE: related document(s) 53).
58
06/16/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 57 Order Withdrawing). Notice Date 06/16/2016.
59
12/21/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Trustee For CIT Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc., F/K/A Vericrest Financial, Inc., as its attorney in fact
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Loan Modification Agreement
3 Attachments
60
12/21/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Trustee For CIT Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc., F/K/A Vericrest Financial, Inc., as its attorney in fact (RE: related document(s) 59 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
61
12/21/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon (RE: related document(s) 59 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Trustee For CIT Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc., F/K/A Vericrest Financial, Inc., as its attorney in fact). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
12/21/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(15-04145-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21536820. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 59) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
12/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 61 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 12/23/2017.
64
01/18/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 1/18/2018 (RE: related document(s) 59 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor The Bank Of New York Mellon, As Trustee For CIT Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc., F/K/A Vericrest Financial, Inc., as its attorney in fact). Hearing scheduled 1/25/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
65
01/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 64 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/20/2018.
66
01/24/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Based on agreement of the parties, this matter is settled; Tom Tutten to submit a separate order.) RE: Doc #59; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr., Attorney for The Bank of New York Mellon
doc
07/05/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.