Remington Kyle Martin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00305 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/13/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
09/13/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
09/13/2018
Credit Counseling Waiver Requested (109(h)) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/13/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
09/13/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/14/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
09/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
09/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
09/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
09/18/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
12
09/18/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
10/01/2018
Request for Special Notice
15
10/03/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
10/18/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/21/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
17
11/21/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
18
11/21/2018
Certificate of Service
11/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
12/13/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
12/13/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
12/13/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
12/18/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
22
12/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/07/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.