Rene Allan Francisco and Agnes Francisco
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00113 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
doc
05/22/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
doc
05/22/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
05/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
05/22/2018
Set Court Fees Due (Use When ECF Filer Filed the Event Needing the Fee) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Certificate of Service
19
07/02/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
20
07/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
07/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
07/05/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
23
07/05/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
07/05/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
25
07/05/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
07/27/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
08/01/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
27
08/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/06/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.