Renee Sharon Felix
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00109 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/09/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
04/09/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
04/09/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
04/09/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/09/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
04/09/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/10/2019
Amended Voluntary Petition
9
04/10/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
10
04/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
04/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
04/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
04/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
04/22/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.