Reyna C Zeid
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-00121 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
41
01/04/2019
Request for Special Notice
42
01/15/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
43
01/15/2019
Exhibit To
44
01/15/2019
Declaration
45
01/15/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
46
01/15/2019
Certificate of Service
01/15/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
02/26/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
48
04/29/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
04/29/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
05/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.