Rhonda Lynett Thurman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01504 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 185 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/24/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
doc
05/24/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
doc
05/24/2018
Trustee Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions
1
04/06/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rhonda Lynett Thurman (Shinn, J.)
2
04/06/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)
3
04/06/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman (Shinn, J.)
5
04/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)
6
04/06/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)
7
04/06/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)
8
04/06/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)
9
04/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/15/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/03/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/16/2018.
10
04/07/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
11
04/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/08/2018.
04/09/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman Case Number 06-00951, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/24/2006, Standard Discharge on 08/14/2009; Case Number 09-05215, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/02/2009, Standard Discharge on 12/17/2013.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
04/09/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman).
13
04/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/11/2018.
14
04/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman). Notice Date 04/11/2018.
15
04/13/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
16
04/15/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
17
04/17/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)
18
04/20/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Tower Loan of Trussville (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)).
19
04/23/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 18 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Tower Loan of Trussville). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
20
05/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/16/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
21
05/24/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
22
05/24/2018
Trustee Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions. (Ch13troffice, ul)
23
05/24/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 22 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
24
05/25/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)).
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/26/2018.
26
05/29/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 24 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
27
06/12/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
28
06/12/2018
Amended Schedule C Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman.
1
Summary of Assets and Liabilities) (Shinn, J.
1 Attachment
29
06/18/2018
Trustee's Withdrawal of Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 21 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.). (Ch13troffice, ul)
30
06/18/2018
Trustee's Withdrawal of Objection to Claim of Exemptions Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 22 Trustee Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions.). (Ch13troffice, ul)
31
06/19/2018
Consent Order on Objection to Confirmation Filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc. Signed on 6/19/2018 (RE: related document(s) 24 Withdrawn - Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.).
32
06/20/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 18 Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Tower Loan of Trussville (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Rhonda Lynett Thurman. (Shinn, J.)).).
33
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Consent Order). Notice Date 06/22/2018.
34
06/27/2018
Amended Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
07/12/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 234.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-01504-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (234.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22273269. Fee Amount 234.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 76.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
08/09/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s)[12] Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
38
09/17/2018
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.