Richard Allen Alexia
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00430 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
12/20/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
12/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
12/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/21/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
7
12/21/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
01/03/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
14
01/03/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
15
01/03/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
16
01/03/2019
Extend Time
17
01/04/2019
Extend Time
18
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
01/14/2019
Entry of Appearance
20
01/14/2019
Extend Time
01/14/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/15/2019
Extend Time
22
01/16/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
23
01/16/2019
Amended Voluntary Petition
24
01/16/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
25
01/16/2019
Schedule A/B (Form 106A/B & 206A/B)
26
01/16/2019
Schedule C (Form 106C)
27
01/16/2019
Schedule D (Form 106D & 206D)
28
01/16/2019
Schedule E/F (Form 106E/F & 206E/F)
29
01/16/2019
Schedule G (Form 106G & 206G)
30
01/16/2019
Schedule H (Form 106H & 206H)
31
01/16/2019
Schedule I (Form 106I)
32
01/16/2019
Schedule J (Form 106J)
33
01/16/2019
Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )
34
01/16/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
35
01/16/2019
Ch 11 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122B)
36
01/16/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
37
01/16/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
38
01/16/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
01/17/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
01/17/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
40
01/17/2019
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
01/17/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/18/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
01/23/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
02/05/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
43
02/11/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
44
02/11/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
02/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
02/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/20/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
03/21/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.