Richard Anthony Michael
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00125 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/19/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
04/19/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
04/19/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
7
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
04/23/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
04/26/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
04/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
12
05/06/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
13
05/06/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
14
05/06/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
15
05/06/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
16
05/06/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
17
05/06/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
05/06/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.