Richard Cecil Bernin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00048 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
06/06/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
19
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/11/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.