Richard Duane Phillips
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00056 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
16
06/05/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
17
06/07/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
18
06/07/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
19
06/07/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
20
06/07/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
21
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
06/19/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
24
06/19/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
25
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
27
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
28
07/20/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
29
07/20/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
30
07/20/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
07/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
07/26/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
35
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/30/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.