Richard Floyd Steele
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00234 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/28/2017
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Richard Floyd Steele
45
06/21/2018
Entry of Appearance
46
08/03/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
47
10/18/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
48
10/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
49
10/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
50
12/28/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
51
12/28/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
52
12/28/2018
Certificate of Service
12/28/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
01/11/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
54
01/14/2019
Hearing
01/14/2019
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
01/21/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
56
01/21/2019
Certificate of Service
01/22/2019
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
01/22/2019
Proceeding Memo
58
01/23/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
02/06/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
02/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
60
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
61
03/12/2019
Proceeding Memo
62
03/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
63
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
64
04/25/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
65
04/25/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
66
05/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
67
05/03/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
68
05/05/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
69
05/07/2019
Hearing
05/20/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.