Richard Joseph Grant
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00583 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 187 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/13/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Richard Joseph Grant
3
02/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Richard Joseph Grant.
4
02/13/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Richard Joseph Grant.
5
02/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/12/2018 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 05/11/2018.
6
02/14/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
7
02/14/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 2/14/2018.
8
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[5] Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.