Richardson v. State of Alaska et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00022 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
05/18/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
30
06/28/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
08/15/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
08/20/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
09/11/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.