Rickey Lee Owens
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82133 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
25
09/18/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
12/20/2018
Request for Clerk to Send Notice of Filing of Claim by Debtor or Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
12/20/2018
Notice of Filing Claim by Debtor or Trustee
37
12/21/2018
Approving
38
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
39
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
03/15/2019
Limit Notice
43
03/18/2019
Motion to Modify Plan

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.