Ricky D. Meredith, Jr. and Autumn E. Meredith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00005 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/08/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/08/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/08/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/09/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
01/09/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
01/09/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
01/09/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
01/10/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
01/11/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
8
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
01/23/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
01/23/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
12
01/23/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
13
01/23/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
14
01/23/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
15
01/23/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
16
01/23/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
01/23/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
03/05/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
03/06/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
03/08/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
03/08/2019
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
03/26/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
20
03/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
03/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
04/09/2019
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
23
04/09/2019
Extend Entry of Discharge
24
04/17/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
25
04/17/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
26
04/24/2019
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
27
04/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
05/09/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
29
05/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.