Ricky Eugene Watts
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01480 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 231 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
1
04/05/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Ricky Eugene Watts (Shinn, J.)
2
04/05/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts. (Shinn, J.)
4
04/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts. (Shinn, J.)
5
04/05/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts. (Shinn, J.)
04/05/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01480-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21923644. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/05/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/09/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/14/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/02/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/09/2018.
7
04/05/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts. (Shinn, J.)
8
04/06/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/06/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Ricky Eugene Watts Case Number 92-01784, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/09/1992, Standard Discharge on 03/05/1996; Case Number 00-04212, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/12/2000, Standard Discharge on 11/08/2005.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/07/2018.
10
04/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/08/2018.
11
04/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts). Notice Date 04/08/2018.
12
04/11/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Leonard N Math Filed by Creditor FAMILY SECURITY CREDIT UNION.
13
05/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 05/09/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
14
05/14/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
15
05/14/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
16
05/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/16/2018.
17
05/30/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Family Security Credit Union(RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts. (Shinn, J.)). Modified on 5/30/2018 to edit text
18
05/30/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor FAMILY SECURITY CREDIT UNION). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
19
06/06/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
20
06/06/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts.
1
Summary of Assets and Liabilities) (Shinn, J.
1 Attachment
21
06/18/2018
Order Withdrawing Signed on 6/18/2018 (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor FAMILY SECURITY CREDIT UNION).
22
06/18/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 3 of Wells Fargo Bank, NA in the amount of $1,594.82 Filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts. (Shinn, J.)
23
06/19/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Ricky Eugene Watts). Hearing scheduled 7/31/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
06/19/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 6/19/2018 (RE: related document(s) 6 Confirmation Hearing, 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/31/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
25
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order Withdrawing). Notice Date 06/20/2018.
26
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/21/2018.
27
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/21/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.