Robert George Wilbert and Jennifer Faye Wilbert
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

7:2017-bk-71527 (alnb)

Certificate of Service Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert (RE: related document(s)[31] Amended Chapter 13 Plan).

Local Form Number LR 3015-1(c) (12/17) IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA WESTERN DIVISION IN RE: Robert George Wilbert CASE NO. 17-71527 Jennifer Faye Wilbert Debtor. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CHAPTER 13 PLAN CONTAINING VALUATION, LIEN AVOIDANCE, § 1301 CODEBTOR STAY RELIEF, OR CONTAINING A NON-STANDARD PROVISION REQUIRING RULE 7004 SERVICE Debtor(s)' chapter 13 plan dated ___01/23/18____________ (Doc. _31____) (check all that all apply): seeks to value collateral and cram down one or more secured claims in Part 3.2 seeks to avoid one or more liens in part 3.4 requests termination of the § 1301 co-debtor stay in Part 3.5 Creditor name and address (If the creditor is an entity other than an Insured Depository Institution ("IDI")*, identify the officer, managing agent, general agent, or other Method of Service agent authorized to receive process to whose attention service was made. If the entity is an IDI, identify the officer to whose attention service was made via certified mail. Standard Furniture Company of Alabama, Inc. First Class Mail % Stuart N. Shevin Certified Mail No. 11 Office Park Circle Birmingham, AL 35223 Standard Furniture First Class Mail PO Box 530130 Certified Mail No. Birmingham, AL 35253 *Most IDIs are banks, credit unions, or savings & loan associations. In accordance with Local Rule 3015-1(c), I certify that the § 1301 co-debtor(s) who are subject to the termination of the § 1301 codebtor stay have been served via First Class U.S. Mail as follows: Name and address Codebtor Collateral Under penalty of perjury, I declare that the foregoing is true and correct. January 23, 2018 /s/ Robert D. Reese Date Signature of Attorney for Debtor(s) or pro se Debtor(s) Name/Address/Telephone/Email Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, P.C. 600 University Park Place, Suite 510 Birmingham, Alabama 35209 (205) 802-2200 / Facsimile: (205) 802-2209 Email: ecfbirmingham@bondnbotes.com Case 17-71527-JHH13 Doc 32 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 13:50:56 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 Case 17-71527-JHH13 Doc 32 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 13:50:56 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Order and Notice of Deadline to Object to Confirmation Signed on 1/23/2018 (RE: related document(s)[31] Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Robert George Wilbert, Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert). Confirmation Hearing scheduled 2/15/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Last day to Object to Confirmation 2/15/2018.

Van−131 [Order & Notice of Deadline to Object] (11/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, WESTERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−71527−JHH13 Robert George Wilbert Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−0495 Jennifer Faye Wilbert SSN: xxx−xx−9222 Debtor(s) ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEADLINE TO OBJECT TO CONFIRMATION On January 23, 2018, the debtor(s) (the "Debtor") in the above−captioned chapter 13 case (the "Case") filed an amended chapter 13 plan (Doc. 31) (as amended, the "Plan"). The confirmation hearing in the Case (the "Confirmation Hearing") is scheduled for Thursday, February 15, 2018 at 01:30 PM in Room 2600, Federal Courthouse, 2005 University Blvd, Tuscaloosa, AL 35401. For cause it is ORDERED, and, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankrutpcy Procedure 2002(a), you are NOTIFIED: 1. February 15, 2018 (the "Objection Deadline") is fixed as the deadline for filing objections to confirmation of the Plan (each, an "Objection"). Timely Objections will be heard with the Confirmation Hearing (as the same may be rescheduled).1 The court will not confirm the Plan before the Objection Deadline expires, nor will the court confirm the Plan before holding a hearing to consider each timely filed Objection. Untimely Objections will not be considered. 2. This order does NOT reschedule the date and time of the Confirmation Hearing. If the court convenes the Confirmation Hearing before the Objection Deadline expires, the court may reschedule the Confirmation Hearing to a later date and time or conclude the Confirmation Hearing, subject to being rescheduled (in the event a party in interest timely files an Objection).2 In the event that a timely Objection is filed less than seven days before the Confirmation Hearing, a party in interest may request a continuance of the Confirmation Hearing and the hearing on the Objection. 3. The Confirmation Hearing may be convened on the noticed date and rescheduled (or concluded subject to being rescheduled) by announcement on the record of the Confirmation Hearing, without further notice. Likewise, the hearing on any Objection may be convened and rescheduled by announcement on the record of the hearing, without further notice. Dated: January 23, 2018 /s/ Jennifer H. Henderson United States Bankruptcy Judge msh ___________________________ 1 If a party in interest timely files an Objection, the clerk of court, or such other party as the court may direct, shall provide notice of the hearing to consider the Objection to the objecting party's attorney (or, if the party is not represented by an attorney, to the party), to the chapter 13 trustee (the "Trustee"), and to the Debtor's attorney (or, if the Debtor is not represented by an attorney, to the Debtor). Registered users of the court's CM/ECF system, and others who have consented in writing to accept notice electronically, will receive notice of the hearing electronically. For Objections filed by the Trustee, the Trustee shall provide notice of the hearing to consider the Objection by listing the date and time of the Confirmation Hearing in the Objection and serving the Objection on the Debtor's attorney (or, if the Debtor is not represented by an attorney, on the Debtor). 2 In the event the Confirmation Hearing is concluded and thereafter rescheduled, the clerk of court shall provide notice of the rescheduled Confirmation Hearing to all parties listed on the noticing matrix. Case 17-71527-JHH13 Doc 33 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 15:59:32 Desc Order & Notice of Deadline to Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/29/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Robert George Wilbert, Jennifer Faye Wilbert
2
08/29/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert. Related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13).
4
08/29/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert.
5
08/29/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert.
6
08/29/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/19/2017 at 09:00 AM at Room 111 Jasper. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/16/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Proof of Claim due by 01/17/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 02/26/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/18/2017.
7
08/29/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert.
08/29/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-71527-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21100722. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/29/2017
Motion to Determine Value of 2006 Chevrolet Trailblazer financed by One Main Financial Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert
9
08/30/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
08/30/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Robert George Wilbert, Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert). Hearing scheduled 11/16/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
11
08/31/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 08/31/2017.
12
09/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Robert George Wilbert, Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert). Notice Date 09/01/2017.
13
09/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/01/2017.
14
09/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/01/2017.
15
10/20/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor appeared.
16
10/25/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert.
17
10/25/2017
Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert.
1
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
1 Attachment
18
10/25/2017
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amended Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert.
19
10/26/2017
Notice of Confirmation Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Amended Chapter 13 Plan dated October 25, 2017 filed by Debtor Robert George Wilbert, Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert). Hearing scheduled 12/14/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
20
10/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/28/2017.
21
11/16/2017
Supplement Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert (RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Determine Value of 2006 Chevrolet Trailblazer financed by One Main Financial).
22
11/20/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #8; Debtors' Motion to Determine Value of Collateral (2006 Chevrolet Trailblazer) of One Main Financial) Hearing scheduled 12/14/2017 at 01:30 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
23
12/07/2017
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 8 Motion to Determine Value of 2006 Chevrolet Trailblazer financed by One Main Financial Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert).
24
12/15/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing RE: Doc #16; Confirmation Hearing on Amended Chapter 13 Plan dated October 25, 2017. Hearing scheduled 01/18/2018 at 01:30 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa
25
12/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/17/2017.
26
12/19/2017
Second Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert (RE: related document(s) 16 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert.).
1
Mailing Matrix
1 Attachment
27
12/20/2017
Order and Notice of Deadline to Object to Confirmation Signed on 12/20/2017 (RE: related document(s) 26 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Robert George Wilbert, Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert). Confirmation Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Last day to Object to Confirmation 1/12/2018.
28
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order and Notice of Deadline to Object to Confirmation). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
29
01/19/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #16; Confirmation Hearing on Amended Chapter 13 Plan dated October 25, 2017) Hearing scheduled 02/15/2018 at 01:30 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
30
01/19/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #26; Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed December 19, 2017) Hearing scheduled 02/15/2018 at 01:30 PM at Room 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
31
01/23/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert (RE: related document(s) 26 Second Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert (RE: related document(s) 16 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert.).
32
01/23/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert, Debtor Robert George Wilbert (RE: related document(s)[31] Amended Chapter 13 Plan).
33
01/23/2018
Order and Notice of Deadline to Object to Confirmation Signed on 1/23/2018 (RE: related document(s)[31] Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Robert George Wilbert, Joint Debtor Jennifer Faye Wilbert). Confirmation Hearing scheduled 2/15/2018 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa. Last day to Object to Confirmation 2/15/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.