Robert Glenn Murphy and Susan Fern Murphy
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2007-bk-00379 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
114
06/29/2018
Substitution of Attorney
115
07/16/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
116
07/16/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
07/16/2018
Terminate Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
117
08/03/2018
Objection to Claim of Exemptions (CM46-COAwith)
118
08/07/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
119
08/07/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
120
08/08/2018
Certificate of Service
121
08/28/2018
Certificate of No Objection
09/04/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.