Robert Jeremy Milwood
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01533 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 149 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/10/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Robert Jeremy Milwood
2
04/10/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood
04/10/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 80 Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/10/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/19/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/09/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/16/2018.
5
04/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood.
6
04/10/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood.
04/10/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-01533-13) [misc,feepay] (80.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21939370. Fee Amount 80.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/10/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood.
8
04/11/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
9
04/11/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
10
04/11/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 2 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood). Final Installment Payment due by 8/13/2018.
11
04/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 4 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/12/2018.
12
04/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Exeter Finance LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
13
04/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/13/2018.
14
04/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood). Notice Date 04/13/2018.
15
04/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Confirmation Hearing). Notice Date 04/13/2018.
17
05/07/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 16 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor State of Alabama, Dept. of Human Resources). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
20
05/24/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/26/2018.
22
06/25/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing; an amended plan, if any, shall be filed on or before July 15, 2018. Signed on 6/25/2018 (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Confirmation Hearing, 16 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor State of Alabama, Dept. of Human Resources, 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 8/2/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
23
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/27/2018.
24
07/13/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood (RE: related document(s) 7 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood.).
1 Attachment
25
07/13/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood.
1 Attachment
1 Attachment
27
07/13/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood.
28
07/13/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of US Department of Education c/o Nelnet in the amount of $17,670.56 Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood.
29
07/13/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 4 of Lease Finance Group in the amount of $2774.76 Filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood.
30
07/16/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 28 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood, 29 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood). Hearing scheduled 8/23/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
31
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/18/2018.
32
08/02/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/2/2018 12:50:28 PM ]. File Size [ 462 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:17 ]. (RE: Doc #16; Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Christine G. Kirkman, Attorney for State of Alabama Department of Human Resources). (adiuser).
33
08/03/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
34
08/10/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. The Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. The Objection to Confirmation filed by DHR is withdrawn. Signed on 8/10/2018 (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Confirmation Hearing, 16 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor State of Alabama, Dept. of Human Resources, 19 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 24 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood).
35
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 08/12/2018.
36
08/14/2018
Notice to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Pay Filing Fee. Show Cause hearing to be held on 8/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
37
08/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Notice to Show Cause). Notice Date 08/16/2018.
38
08/27/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/23/2018 10:32:02 AM ]. File Size [ 374 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:02 ]. (RE: Doc #28; Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of US Department of Education c/o Nelnet in the amount of $17,670.56). (adiuser).
39
08/27/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 8/27/2018 (RE: related document(s) 28 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood, 29 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Robert Jeremy Milwood). Hearing scheduled 8/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
46
01/11/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
47
01/15/2019
Transfer of Claim

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.