Robert Lee Fuller, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04487 (alnb)

Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor NASA Federal Credit Union

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION – BIRMINGHAM In re Bk. No. 17-04487-TOM7 Robert Lee Fuller, Jr., CHAPTER 7 Debtor. NASA Federal Credit Union, its assignees and/or successors in interest, Movant, and Robert Lee Fuller, Jr.; Thomas E Reynolds, Trustee, Respondents. MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY Now comes NASA Federal Credit Union, its assignees and/or successors in interest, a creditor in the above-styled Bankruptcy case ("Movant" herein), and moves this Court to enter an Order terminating the Automatic Stay imposed by §362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code. As grounds for its motion, Movant states as follows: 1. This Court has jurisdiction and venue over this contested matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§157, 1334 and 1409 and 11 U.S.C. §362. 2. That on or about October 18, 2017, the above named Debtor filed his Chapter 7 Petition in Bankruptcy with this Court. 3. Prior to the filing of the petition, on December 7, 2016, Debtor(s) made, executed and delivered a Retail Installment Contract ("Contract") to Movant or its predecessor, which 1 Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 5 bears interest as specified therein. The original Contract is held by Movant and a copy is attached hereto as Exhibit "A" and is incorporated by reference. 4. The indebtedness evidenced by the Contract is secured by a security interest in a 2017 Ford Mustang, VIN 1FA6P8CFXH5224353 ("the Vehicle") as evidenced by a Certificate of Title, filed with the Department of Motor Vehicles, a copy of which is attached hereto as Exhibit "B" and is made a part hereof. 5. Debtor has indicated his intent to surrender the subject vehicle as indicated in this filed Statement of Intention, a copy of which is attached hereto as Exhibit "C" and is made a part hereof. 6. As of December 21, 2017, the outstanding Obligations are: Unpaid Principal Balance $42,535.56 Unpaid, Accrued Interest $761.90 Late Charge $33.18 Less: Partial Payments ($0.00) Minimum Outstanding Obligations $43,330.64 7. In addition to the other amounts due to Movant reflected herein, as of the date hereof, in connection with seeking the relief requested in the Motion, Movant has also incurred $831.00 in legal fees and costs. Movant reserves all rights to seek an award or allowance of such fees and costs in accordance with applicable loan documents and related agreements, the Bankruptcy Code and otherwise applicable law. 8. The following chart sets forth the number and amount of payments due pursuant to the terms of the Contract that have been missed by the Debtor: Number of Missed From To Monthly Total Missed Payments Payment Payments Amount 1 11/21/2017 11/21/2017 $663.52 $663.52 2 Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 5 1 12/21/2017 12/21/2017 $668.19 $668.19 Late Charge Due $33.18 Less post-petition partial payments: ($0.00) Total: $1,364.89 9. Movant has elected to initiate proceedings to take possession of the Vehicle with respect to the subject Contract; however, Movant is precluded from proceeding to commence said actions to take possession during the pendency of this Bankruptcy. 10. Based upon the foregoing, Movant alleges that Movant is not adequately protected, that the subject Vehicle is not necessary to effectuate Debtor's rehabilitation, and that it would be unfair and inequitable to delay this Movant in taking possession of Movant's interest. Movant urges that this Court issue an Order herein permitting this Movant to proceed with any necessary action to obtain possession of the Vehicle and to dispose of same in a commercially reasonable manner. 11. Thomas E Reynolds has been appointed by this Court as the Chapter 7 Trustee in this instant Bankruptcy proceeding. By virtue of his position as Trustee of the estate of Debtor herein, he holds title to the subject Vehicle in that capacity. To the extent the relief sought herein is granted, Thomas E Reynolds, Trustee, is bound by any such judgment. 12. The commercially reasonable value of the Vehicle is approximately $33,800.00, as indicated in the N.A.D.A. Official Used Car Guide, as evidenced by Exhibit "D" attached hereto and made a part hereof. 13. This Court has jurisdiction of this action pursuant to the provisions of Title 28 U.S.C. Sections 1334 and 157 and 11 U.S.C. Section 362(d). WHEREFORE, Movant prays judgment as follows: 1.) For an Order granting relief from the Automatic Stay, permitting this Movant to move ahead with any necessary actions to take possession of the subject Vehicle under Movant's Contract and to dispose of same in a commercially reasonable manner. 2.) For an Order granting relief as to the Chapter 7 Trustee's interest in subject 3 Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 5 Vehicle. 3.) For attorneys' fees and costs of suit incurred herein. 4.) For an Order waiving the 14-day stay described by Bankruptcy Rule 4001(a)(3). 5.) For such other relief as this Court deems appropriate. Dated: 1/22/2018 By: /s/ Michael E. Bybee MICHAEL E. BYBEE Retained Counsel 2107 5th Avenue North, Suite 200 Birmingham, Alabama 35203-3387 (205) 252-1622 N.106-092 4 Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on 22nd day of January, 2018, I electronically filed the MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY with the Clerk of the Court using the ECF system which will send notification of such filing to the following: Bradford W. Botes, Attorney for Debtor, ecfbirmingham@bondnbotes.com Thomas E Reynolds, Chapter 7 Trustee, ter@reynoldslegalsolutions.com U.S. Trustee and I certify that I have mailed by United States Postal Service the MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY to the following non-ECF participants: Robert Lee Fuller, Jr. 3917 Davis Lane Pinson, AL 35126 Debtor SSN xxx-xx-7996 /s/Michael E. Bybee 5 Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Main Document Page 5 of 5

Exhibit A

i?t t"t6ralrEltlsatEcot{ti cI -SIPLlax flc€ a-ll RE 0urx ARErr xx rE{lloral fu@,{ I I 352r5 BtssEEr. lL 35022 \ttftfuF'dcooqp,ilr,',D'!.'fue!evdds.d $s.t..(.&rM -;.-r tu D.fl4fu*Bfitrdrej't,h.sNo. I I r---fr8---r--EEi- lDdlrddlEr- bFq IAhi.rl dl{& I l'-":-1, T., i Y@,P.,m.ds.n.dul.wll6.] tk .!rer,!bs 4r2, .t3 (1" s O o,r.l CrarirlMd ! o-t5dr li4 16lr, l/t l/l tl, h&k tlr _,. r Lari,d- '.8 b,rrdrntq.s,|'d'iefr,fu 1 6e'&qr lr,lq*q rE$ z0!5 t0.0 n sTaui I t -_.t?!tt-@ OirOrada ruE r ____LiEo.o fubFE,l^6drh,eE il urx,/. a.. -- ! v^ 3 il/r !l,tDl@h xrA-. .q4!+e4 q!4.4ai 'fttur luf, - ! crdl.lE! r kh,q!i4-ndb I. .{q!!eE4!4ii *do4lrddti.Fn 9.!,i, IlA Cn]|IlI b'*'bb! JII- L*a;- vr-r I &r ' ' OOC b r,t__ *dsA€- i/r r !ur I razr.Ir.r rF!.rr*''!fiEF+d -dryE,'arn-rr. .- -ilL 5 ut --4i+Ertidl,, u*. r,11-. " .-,r.3.x,l^ No cloLrMiiFTEi sure hw rro{. @r pD'rd.,q r "c@lin! otl d c.^o.[.lro. F.rod lor lhL sb. AtLr ]ou .lan rn|. co^lrEl I v." my o.rv en..l rr r lh nrhr.ge d Lr lad c.c-,Ya c.6ot 4nd fl. @nE .r.l Fly b.c.ux I y.LtnMot yM nhd rhl. ndle dr..ol.pclY lo lsn..dlg!!!6L. -) o.,ld .lr. h hl.r.,d d0.. F-o i,o,6hd,o,le.r !h! 'i,i.od,E Yc !e b rh, trnr ot rht otha e t dirrrr rMs Effii' ye r{..d ifl',I{ cdildr Ytu loliF o!! h.tr. e r'.'{d hn lonter 0d r rLn ro r.!..E Ylu iNtt L Lr. tth nd i6 hd. .4w d v'i! M,ln lni FU Bd. cd.n filrd- cn y d. dcudrfi rls,o rtd,s crrnon lr F qrotrrrr rF^tyou fiosoucHlv FCAor}lE co m^cr BEroeE 'lr yo{r sr6r n. o-. *",r < i ''- .4 l. 0.. r2lor,,r6('e d (q, x, .',, .,vA ---.l!fi r co nY lono ILS t EXHIBIT A Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11-1 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Exhibit A Page 1 of 2 4. 3eUEF o6al.lrrs 1r ... u. adl, nr.ro n t t6,*r..|y..' 4t.E 'Aiir{fi86 i.b t -to|- .qf.d ynhh 90,.rr rEn rh. rLr. ol tnL 6tu*r, [!. s.n r dkr e trfrn ., ur.! ryi.t'l'.d'Mh.Y.hkl.,'n&! wulb..lm.!r[d.lfiyd rh6,l]4tMcta't.'eq t u..d cr &Fi crrd..lh 6@no. rw s q lrr ifill'dlo[b.dl..l,.lil..l'.nol,!Ldta t*6.rion 6 rlr $nr fth enr4: rt 6d.ry p@lrldr ii tb Md ol ra Sp.nrih Yrnr.i.n: Cur.,.n &itr!!.r.r d! u..dd u intdE*i6. qu. v. .n .r '!n{!b. xE. caEon co[Yaafi ls 6uEJ nE oElroR cout AssaEr 10l]116r rHE gEttrn oF co.l)s oa 6ta1/lcrs osr$.ro prr.sbF *Ero oF t/,lnl IHI PiOCEEOS HEiEOT TECOVFfr {E'EUIIOCR BY I1IE OE'IOi SAALI TdT EICEED ATOUIls PAIO 6Y Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11-1 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Exhibit A Page 2 of 2

Exhibit B

I I Lien and Title lnformation Report 3081.NASA F C U Customer Fuller,Robert VIN 1FA6P8CFXH5224353 Organizafion lD Redacted Organization Name NASAFCU Lien Start 01l10no17 Lien End Original Loan Amount $45,793.00 Lien Balance Amount $45.793.00 Lien Type Retail Oealer lD Lasl ELT Transactiong Borrowor / Lesee Details Name Fuller,Robert Address 309 39th Ave Ne,Centerpoint A1,35215 Vshicle lnfomatlon Vehicle Type Auto Meke FORD Model MUSTANG Year 2017 Mileage 0 Title lnfomation Title Number Redacted Title State AL Tag Number vtN 1FA6P8CFXH5224353 Status MATCHED Match oate 01t11D017 Llen Expiratlon Date Media Type Paper State lnformatlon Name ROBERT L FULLER JR Le39€e Address 309 39TH AVENUE NE,CENTER POINT 41,35215 Vehicle Typo Auto Mak6 FORD Model MUSTANG Year 2017 l'rilease a7 Title Stat6 Titlo Number Redacted Brands EXHIBIT B Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11-2 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Exhibit B Page 1 of 1

Exhibit C

Fill in this information to identify your case: Debtor 1 Robert Lee Fuller, Jr. First Name Middle Name Last Name Debtor 2 (Spouse if, filing) First Name Middle Name Last Name United States Bankruptcy Court for the: NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA Case number (if known) Check if this is an amended filing Official Form 108 Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 12/15 If you are an individual filing under chapter 7, you must fill out this form if: creditors have claims secured by your property, or you have leased personal property and the lease has not expired. You must file this form with the court within 30 days after you file your bankruptcy petition or by the date set for the meeting of creditors, whichever is earlier, unless the court extends the time for cause. You must also send copies to the creditors and lessors you list on the form If two married people are filing together in a joint case, both are equally responsible for supplying correct information. Both debtors must sign and date the form. Be as complete and accurate as possible. If more space is needed, attach a separate sheet to this form. On the top of any additional pages, write your name and case number (if known). Part 1: List Your Creditors Who Have Secured Claims 1. For any creditors that you listed in Part 1 of Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D), fill in the information below. Identify the creditor and the property that is collateral What do you intend to do with the property that Did you claim the property secures a debt? as exempt on Schedule C? Creditor's AMERIHOME MTG CO, LLC Surrender the property. No name: Retain the property and redeem it. Retain the property and enter into a Yes Description of 309 39th Avenue Northeast Reaffirmation Agreement. property Birmingham, AL 35215 Retain the property and [explain]: securing debt: Jefferson County Creditor's NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UN Surrender the property. No name: Retain the property and redeem it. Retain the property and enter into a Yes Description of 2017 FORD MUSTANG 12,000 Reaffirmation Agreement. property miles Retain the property and [explain]: securing debt: Creditor's NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UN Surrender the property. No name: Retain the property and redeem it. Retain the property and enter into a Yes Description of 2014 FORD F-150 29,560 miles Reaffirmation Agreement. property Retain the property and [explain]: Official Form 108 Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 page 1 Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy EXHIBIT C Case Case17-04487-TOM7 17-04487-TOM7 Doc Doc111-3 FiledFiled 10/18/17 01/22/18 Entered Entered 10/18/17 01/22/18 16:53:09 17:32:20 DescDesc Main Document Exhibit C Page 1 44ofof264 Debtor 1 Robert Lee Fuller, Jr. Case number (if known) securing debt: Part 2: List Your Unexpired Personal Property Leases For any unexpired personal property lease that you listed in Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G), fill in the information below. Do not list real estate leases. Unexpired leases are leases that are still in effect; the lease period has not yet ended. You may assume an unexpired personal property lease if the trustee does not assume it. 11 U.S.C. § 365(p)(2). Describe your unexpired personal property leases Will the lease be assumed? Lessor's name: WESTGATE RESORT AT GATLINBURG No Yes Description of leased LEASED TIMESHARE Property: Part 3: Sign Below Under penalty of perjury, I declare that I have indicated my intention about any property of my estate that secures a debt and any personal property that is subject to an unexpired lease. X /s/ Robert Lee Fuller, Jr. X Robert Lee Fuller, Jr. Signature of Debtor 2 Signature of Debtor 1 Date October 18, 2017 Date Official Form 108 Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 page 2 Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case Case17-04487-TOM7 17-04487-TOM7 Doc Doc111-3 FiledFiled 10/18/17 01/22/18 Entered Entered 10/18/17 01/22/18 16:53:09 17:32:20 DescDesc Main Document Exhibit C Page 2 45ofof264

Exhibit D

t2t21t2u1 N'tnl NADA Used Can/Irucks Chelsea Groton Savings Bank Vehicle lnformation Vehicle: 2017 Ford MustangCoupe 2D 5.0tV8 GT Region: Southeastern Period: December2l,20l7 \i VIN: 1FAOP8CFXH5224353 ! lVileage: 17,500,) \: Base MSRP: 532,645 Typically Equipped MSRP: 535,290 Weight 3,705 NADA Used Cars/Trucks Values Auction' Base Mileage Adj. 0ption Adj. Adjasted Vahe Low $22,675 $241 N/A $22,916 Average $25,700 $241 N/A $25,941 High $28,750 $241 N/A $28,991 Tradeln Rough $24,700 N/A $1,7s0 $26,450 Average $26,200 N/A $1,750 $27,9s0 Clean $27,400 N/A $1,750 $29,15{' Clean Loan $24,675 N/A $1,750 $26,425 Clean Retail $30,000 N/A $3,800 $33,800 Tho ardd d6ddd i td(h Irid €CoFBr rd aqrffiir.ril606 rn rryoltEHlding apCld. @1* rEin ar., di\.t!rn rt ttn Selected 0ptions Tradeln/Loan Reta il Performance Pkg. $1,750 $1,950 Certified Pre-Owned N/A $1,850 Wout Navigation System w/body w/body Wout Leather Seats w/body wibody Wout Auto. Trans. w/body w/body EXHIBIT D Mm Lbd e Grd. ffirc G$diUlity d li*iliV id dV al!! r ciia(rtro,ly rltis(rrs6 ddtctrEde b, dl,dlo m tis,!,ot OAid€ rd jblogo e MOA Lbd rra.rerEkol t&ricC Aiqrdr. fdciAtEddidr, rEd uldstiGE byJO Fod.ild Asod.t 3 GrO17JOF..rdAaial6 'Eqisrqld Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11-4 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Exhibit D Page 1 of 1

Affidavit

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION - BIRMINGHAM In re Bk. No. 17 - 04487 - TOM7 Robert Lee Fuller, Jr ., CHAPTER 7 Debtor. NASA Federal Credit Union, its assignees and / or successors in interest, Movant, and Robert Lee Fuller, Jr .; Thomas E Reynolds, Trustee, Respondents. AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY STATE OF _ Maryland STATE OF COUNTY O COUNTY OF Hlne Hr, being duly sworn, deposes and says: 1. That he / she is the custodian of records for NASA Federal Credit Union, and has authority to make this affidavit. 2. That Affiant has under his / her direction, supervision and control all records, ledgers, contracts, mortgages and notes pertaining to the account of NASA Federal Credit Union. 3. That on the 7th day of December 2016, the Debtor did execute a Retail Installment Contract covering the Vehicle described as 2017 Ford Mustang, VIN 1FAGP8CFXH5224353. 4. That said Retail Installment Contract was in the usual and general course of business duly transferred and assigned for a valuable consideration to Movant. 5. That the aforesaid Contract called for a principal payment of $ 668. 19 with interest at a rate of 5. 89 % per annum until the balance was paid in full; that said balance was to be paid Case 17 - 04487 - TOM7 Doc 11 - 5 Filed 01 / 22 / 18 Entered 01 / 22 / 18 17: 32: 20 Desc Affidavit Page 1 of 2 by the Debtor in equal monthly installments of $ 668. 19 beginning on the 21st day of January 2017, and continuing thereafter on the 21st day of each month until the total balance was satisfied. 6. Movant states that the Retail Installment Contract herein referred to is currently due for the November 21, 2017 payment, plus late charges and attorney fees; that the current principal balance of $ 42, 535. 56 is due, plus interest; that the commercially reasonable value of the aforesaid Vehicle is in the sum of $ 33, 800. 00; that there is no equity in subject Vehicle, and that Movant's interest in same is superior to that of the Trustee. Pursuant to 28U.S. C. E 1746, I hereby declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the United States of America that the foregoing is true and correct. Dated this 18 " day of banny dəy _ at che Aledore UD " (city and state) NASA Federal Credit Union, its assignees and / or successors in interest BY: IUR ADALAH Name: Rolany H. Goet Title: do testim Menetgi Sworn to and subscribed before me this day of NOTARY PUBLIC FARAH SADEGHIAN Notary Public - Maryland Anne Arundel County My Commission Expires April 13, 2020 Case 17 - 04487 - TOM7 Doc 11 - 5 Filed 01 / 22 / 18 Entered 01 / 22 / 18 17: 32: 20 Desc Affidavit Page 2 of 2

Proposed Order

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION – BIRMINGHAM In re Bk. No. 17-04487-TOM7 Robert Lee Fuller, Jr., CHAPTER 7 Debtor. NASA Federal Credit Union, its assignees and/or successors in interest, Movant, and Robert Lee Fuller, Jr.; Thomas E Reynolds, Trustee, Respondents. ORDER FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY It appearing that neither the Debtor nor the Chapter 7 Trustee has any opposition to Movant's Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay, and with good cause appearing therefore, the Court makes its Order as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Automatic Stay in the above-entitled Bankruptcy proceeding is immediately vacated and extinguished for all purposes as to Movant, its assignees and/or successors in interest, and Movant, its assignees and/or successors in interest may proceed with any actions necessary to take possession of the subject Vehicle described as a 2017 Ford Mustang, VIN 1FA6P8CFXH5224353 pursuant to applicable statutory law and to dispose of same in a commercially reasonable manner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that entry of this order shall be deemed to constitute relief from the automatic stay as to any interest the Chapter 7 Trustee may have in the subject Vehicle. 1 Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11-6 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Proposed Order Page 1 of 2 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 14-day stay provided by Bankruptcy Rule 4001(a)(3) is waived. Tamara O Mitchell JUDGE OF THE BANKRUPTCY COURT MICHAEL E. BYBEE, ESQUIRE Retained Counsel 2107 5th Avenue North, Suite 200 Birmingham, Alabama 35203-3387 (205) 252-1622 N.106-092 2 Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 11-6 Filed 01/22/18 Entered 01/22/18 17:32:20 Desc Proposed Order Page 2 of 2

Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor NASA Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s)[11] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).

Form Number LR 4001 - 1 A (07 / 10) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA NORTHERN DIVISION In re: Robert Lee Fuller, Jr. Case No. 17 - 04487 - TOM7 Chapter 7 Debtor (s) FACT SUMMARY SHEET FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY OR FOR ADEQUATE PROTECTION IN CHAPTER 7 AND 13 CASES Type of Loan / Credit Transaction: Consumer Date of Loan / Credit Transaction 12 / 7 / 2016 Type of Collateral: Vehicle Monthly Payment: $ 668. 19 Amount Financed: $ 45, 793. 00 APR or Interest Rate: 5. 89 % Term of Loan: 84 months or years Payoff Amount: $ 43, 330. 64 as of 12 / 21 / 2017 (Date) Value of Collateral and Basis: $ 33, 800. 00 (Value) as of 12 / 21 / 2017 (Date) and NADA (Basis) Address of real property: 2017 Ford Mustang, VIN IFA6P8CFXH5224353 Delinquent Pre - Petition Payments: What Month (s) ? Amount ? Claim filed ? Date claim filed: Yes No Claim Number Number of Months of Pre - Petition Payment Default Put into Debtor's Chapter 13 Plan: Delinquent Post - Petition Payments: What Month (s) ? Amount of mortgage payments ? Late Charges ? Court Costs / Attorney's fees ? Total Amount Due Claim filed ? Date claim filed: 11 / 21 / 2017 - 12 / 21 / 2017 $ 663. 52 & $ 668. 19 $ 33. 18 $ 831. 00 $ 2, 195. 89 Yes No Claim Number Number of Post - Petition Payments Received (Not How Applied): Number of Post - Petition Payments Held by Creditor but Not Applied to Debt: Number of Post - Petition Payments Returned by Creditor to Debtor: If Lease, Lease Expiration Date: If Terminated, Lease Termination Date: Yes Insurer of Collateral: Term of Insurance: (Expiration Date) Prior Stay Order (s) Involving Movant, including Current Case: V No If yes, give case number (s) and date (s) of order (s) Case No .: Date: Case No .: Date: Case No .: Date: Debtor's Statement of Intention: Debtor is surrendering per filed Statement of Intention. Date: _ / 18 / de 1 8 Date: Submited by: falf detak Submitted by: (signature) Case 17 - 04487 - TOM7 Doc 12 Filed 01 / 22 / 18 Entered 01 / 22 / 18 17: 34: 49 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Michael Bybee, Attorney for NASA Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s)[11] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor NASA Federal Credit Union). Hearing scheduled 2/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.

Van−014 [Notice of Final Hearing] (Rev. 07/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−04487−TOM7 Robert Lee Fuller Jr. Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−7996 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING Notice is hereby given that Michael Bybee, Attorney for NASA Federal Credit Union filed a Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay in the above−styled case. The preliminary hearing shall be consolidated with the final evidentiary hearing and parties are to be prepared for trial. The final hearing will be held to consider and act upon said Motion. Date: Thursday, February 8, 2018 Time: 10:00 AM Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 3, Birmingham, AL 35203 Attendance is not required if a settlement has been reached as approved by all parties and filed with the Court by an attorney prior to the hearing date. Dated: January 23, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court jlp Case 17-04487-TOM7 Doc 13 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 08:34:39 Desc Notice of Final Hearing Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 269 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/18/2017
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Robert Lee Fuller Jr. (Shinn, J.)
3
10/18/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Robert Lee Fuller Jr. (Shinn, J.)
4
10/18/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Robert Lee Fuller Jr. (Shinn, J.)
10/18/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(17-04487-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21296702. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/18/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/27/2017 at 02:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 01/26/2018.
6
10/19/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10/19/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Robert Lee Fuller, Jr. Case Number 94-00286, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/14/1994, Standard Discharge on 09/09/1998.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/19/2017
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 10/19/2017.
8
10/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 10/20/2017.
9
10/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 10/21/2017.
10
10/24/2017
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Robert Lee Fuller Jr.
11/28/2017
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Thomas E Reynolds, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 172320.00, Assets Exempt: $ 237500.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 231075.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 231075.00. Debtor appeared. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
01/22/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor NASA Federal Credit Union
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Affidavit
6
Proposed Order
6 Attachments
01/22/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-04487-TOM7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21632378. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 11) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
01/22/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor NASA Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s)[11] Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
13
01/23/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Michael Bybee, Attorney for NASA Federal Credit Union (RE: related document(s)[11] Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor NASA Federal Credit Union). Hearing scheduled 2/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.