Robert R Rennie
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00062 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
doc
05/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
doc
06/01/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
27
06/13/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
28
07/12/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
29
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
30
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
31
07/20/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
07/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
08/09/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
33
11/05/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.