Robert Thornton Fudge, II and Merna Villar Fudge
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00024 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
57
08/01/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
58
08/31/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
59
08/31/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
60
08/31/2018
Certificate of Service
08/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
09/18/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
09/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
09/20/2018
Hearing
63
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
64
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.