Robert lee Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00166 (alnb)

Trustee's Request for Case Status Change Requiring Action Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds.

THOMAS E. REYNOLDS, TRUSTEE 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N. Suite 502 Birmingham, AL 35203 REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS CHANGE I REQUIRING ACTION Clerk, United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama Robert S. Vance Federal Building 1800 Fifth Avenue North Birmingham, AL 35203 Re: Robert Lee Johnson Bankruptcy Case No. 18 - 00166 Dear Sir / Madam: Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 (e), the original notice of the meeting of creditors mailed in the above - style case provided that no claims should be filed because the Debtor's schedules described no assets from which dividends could be generated. Since then, I discovered property of the estate that will be or has been reduced to cash. After payment of administrative expenses, it appears there will be a distribution to unsecured creditors. Please notify creditors to file proofs of claims. Yours very truly, hennilegale / s / Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Thomas E. Reynolds, Trustee Case 18 - 00166 - DSC7 Doc 11 Filed 02 / 13 / 18 Entered 02 / 13 / 18 11: 28: 27 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Notice to Creditors to File Claims within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90-day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later

Van−004 [Notice to File Claims] (Rev. 03/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 18−00166−DSC7 Robert Lee Johnson Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−3297 Debtor(s) NOTICE TO FILE CLAIMS Notice is hereby given that there may be assets from which a dividend could be paid in this case. Any creditor wishing to participate if there are proceeds from assets available for distribution must, pursuant to Rule 3002 (c)(5) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, file a proof of claim within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90−day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later. Notice is further given that should you fail to file a claim within the time fixed, your claim may be barred. If you have previously filed such a claim, you need not file again. A proof of claim form can be obtained at any bankruptcy clerk's office or by visiting www.uscourts.gov/forms/bankruptcy−forms. Claims can be filed electronically through the court's website at: www.alnb.uscourts.gov/electronic−proof−claim. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court rwh Case 18-00166-DSC7 Doc 12 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 13:48:28 Desc Notice to File Claims Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[12] Notice to Creditors to File Claims). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 18-00166-DSC Robert Lee Johnson Chapter 7 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: rharless Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: van004 Total Noticed: 25 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db +Robert Lee Johnson, 8011 Margaret Circle, Mc Calla, AL 35111-3033 9608057 +BB&T, Attn: Bankruptcy Department, 6010 Golding Center Dr., Winston Salem, NC 27103-9815 9608054 +Internal Revenue Service TCS BHAM, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6426 9608059 +Leroys Jewelers, Sterling Jewelers, Inc/Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 1799, Akron, OH 44309-1799 9608061 +Mortgage Service Cente, Attn: Bankruptcy Dept, Po Box 5452, Mt Laurel, NJ 08054-5452 9608055 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 9608052 +Usaa Fed Svng/nationst, 10750 Mcdermott Fwy, San Antonio, TX 78288-1600 9608072 +Usaa/dovenmuehle, Attn: Bankruptcy, 10750 Mcdermott Freeway, San Antonio, TX 78288-1600 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. tr +EDI: QTEREYNOLDS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Thomas E Reynolds, Reynolds Legal Solutions, LLC, 300 Richard Arrington Jr. Blvd. N, Suite 503, Birmingham, AL 35203-3354 smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 18:29:23 Thomas Corbett, BA Birmingham, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 9608056 +E-mail/Text: dhrcscbu@dhr.alabama.gov Feb 13 2018 18:28:36 AL Child Support, Child Support Payment Center, Po Box 244015, Montgomery, AL 36124-4015 9623498 EDI: ALDEPREV.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Alabama Department of Revenue, Legal Division, P.O. Box 320001, Montgomery, Alabama 36132-0001 9608060 EDI: CBSAAFES.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Military Star/AAFES, Attention: Bankruptcy, Po Box 650060, Dallas, TX 75265 9608058 +EDI: WFNNB.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Comenitycapital/gmstop, Comenity Bank, Po Box 182125, Columbus, OH 43218-2125 9608053 EDI: IRS.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Internal Revenue Service, CIO: Bankruptcy, POB 7346, Philadelphia, PA 19101-7346 9608062 +Fax: 407-737-5634 Feb 13 2018 18:36:48 Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc, Attn: Research/Bankruptcy, 1661 Worthington Rd Ste 100, West Palm Bch, FL 33409-6493 9608064 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Syncb/Rooms To Go, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9608063 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Syncb/frdmrc, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9608065 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Syncb/thomasville, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9608066 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Synchrony Bank/Sams, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9608067 +EDI: CHRYSLER.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Td Auto Finance, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 551080, Jacksonville, FL 32255-1080 9608069 +EDI: USAA.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 USAA Federal Savings Bank, Attn: Bankruptcy, 10750 Mcdermott Freeway, San Antonio, TX 78288-1600 9608068 +E-mail/Text: EBankruptcy@UCFS.NET Feb 13 2018 18:31:05 United Consumer Financial Services, 865 Bassett Rd, Westlake, OH 44145-1194 9608070 +EDI: USAA.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Usaa Svg Bk, Attn: Bankruptcy, 10750 Mcdermott Freeway, San Antonio, TX 78288-1600 9608071 +EDI: USAA.COM Feb 13 2018 18:08:00 Usaa Svg Bk, 10750 Mcdermott, San Antonio, TX 78288-1600 TOTAL: 17 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens Case 18-00166-DSC7 Doc 13 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 3 District/off: 1126-2 User: rharless Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: van004 Total Noticed: 25 _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Robert Lee Johnson brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Jonathan Mancil Smothers on behalf of Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper Servicer for USAA Federal Savings Bank ("Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper") jsmothers@logs.com, ncbkmail@shapiro-ingle.com Thomas E Reynolds ter@reynoldslegalsolutions.com, treynolds@ecf.epiqsystems.com;dnm@reynoldslegalsolutions.com TOTAL: 3 Case 18-00166-DSC7 Doc 13 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 3 Van−004 [Notice to File Claims] (Rev. 03/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 18−00166−DSC7 Robert Lee Johnson Chapter 7 SSN: xxx−xx−3297 Debtor(s) NOTICE TO FILE CLAIMS Notice is hereby given that there may be assets from which a dividend could be paid in this case. Any creditor wishing to participate if there are proceeds from assets available for distribution must, pursuant to Rule 3002 (c)(5) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, file a proof of claim within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90−day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later. Notice is further given that should you fail to file a claim within the time fixed, your claim may be barred. If you have previously filed such a claim, you need not file again. A proof of claim form can be obtained at any bankruptcy clerk's office or by visiting www.uscourts.gov/forms/bankruptcy−forms. Claims can be filed electronically through the court's website at: www.alnb.uscourts.gov/electronic−proof−claim. Dated: February 13, 2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court rwh Case 18-00166-DSC7 Doc 13 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 3

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 220 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/15/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Robert Lee Johnson
3
01/15/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Robert Lee Johnson.
4
01/15/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Robert Lee Johnson.
01/15/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00166-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21604930. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/15/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/12/2018 at 03:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 04/13/2018.
6
01/16/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
7
01/16/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 1/16/2018.
8
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
9
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
10
01/23/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper Servicer for USAA Federal Savings Bank ("Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper").
11
02/13/2018
Trustee's Request for Case Status Change Requiring Action Filed by Trustee Thomas E Reynolds.
12
02/13/2018
Notice to Creditors to File Claims within 90 days after the mailing of this notice. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed within the 90-day deadline or within 180 days after the date of the order for relief in this case, whichever is later
13
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[12] Notice to Creditors to File Claims). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
doc
05/22/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 or 11 Indiv.)
doc
05/23/2018
Letter
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.