Robinson v. Outback Steakhouse, et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:1996-cv-00828 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 513 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/16/1996
DEMAND for jury trial by Paula Melanie Robinson (dkt clerk)
2
05/20/1996
SUMMONS issued for Outback Steakhouse, Aussie Restaurant, Aussie Realty, Keith Burbank; summons and complaint mailed by cmrrr to named defendants. (dkt clerk)
3
05/22/1996
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on (Illegible) on 5/21/96 for Outback Steakhouse. Answer due on 6/10/96 for Outback Steakhouse
4
05/23/1996
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on (Illegible) on 5/22/96 for Aussie Realty. Answer due on 6/11/96 for Aussie Realty
5
05/28/1996
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on Paul Kennedy on 5/24/96 for Keith Burbank. Answer due on 6/13/96 for Keith Burbank (dkt clerk)
6
06/12/1996
ANSWER to Complaint by Outback Steakhouse, Aussie Restaurant, Aussie Realty (Attorney Dent M. Morton), referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
7
06/13/1996
ANSWER to Complaint by Keith Burbank (pro-se), referred to Judge Ira De Ment (dkt clerk)
8
07/08/1996
MOTION by Paula Melanie Robinson to Dismiss Named Defendant Aussie Realty Partners ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
9
07/12/1996
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Keith Burbank by James S. Lloyd (dkt clerk)
10
07/19/1996
ORDER, set Rule 16 Status Conference 1:30 7/30/96 before Judge Ira De Ment (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT and RL. (dkt clerk)
11
08/12/1996
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Keith Burbank by Gerald Alan Templeton
08/14/1996
Stamped ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Dismiss Named Defendant Aussie Realty Partners (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/26/1996
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Aussie Restaurant by Ronald G. Davenport, referred to Judge DeMent.
13
08/29/1996
ORDER, set Telephone Conference for 9:30 9/11/96 ; that counsel for plaintiff set up the call (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
14
09/26/1996
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 9/3/97 before Judge Ira De Ment Motion Filing deadline on 6/5/97 ; Discovery cutoff 8/20/97 ; jury trial set for 10/6/97 before Judge Ira De Ment ; set amended pleading deadline for 12/10/96 Mediation Notice deadline on 1/5/97 (AOFORM 85 attached) (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL, MT.
15
10/01/1996
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Outback Steakhouse by Ronald G. Davenport
16
10/11/1996
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Keith Burbank by William H. Brittain II
17
10/18/1996
Plaintiff's Computation of Damages, referred to Judge DeMent.
18
11/14/1996
MOTION by Keith Burbank for Judgment on the Pleadings ; referred to Judge Ira De Ment
19
11/18/1996
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendant Keith Burbank's motion for judgment on the pleadings filed ll/l4/96 should not be granted: Response to Order to Show Cause due on 12/25/96 for Paula Melanie Robinson (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
20
12/13/1996
MOTION for W.H. Brittain, II to Withdraw as Attorney referred to Judge Ira De Ment
01/13/1997
Stamped ORDER granting [20-1] motion for W.H. Brittain, II to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney William H. Brittain for Keith Burbank (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/21/1997
ORDER granting defendant Burbank's [18-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (war) Modified on 01/24/1997
22
01/24/1997
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Keith Burbank by Albry Joe Peddy
23
05/29/1997
MOTION by Outback Steakhouse, Aussie Restaurant to Extend Time for Dispositive Motions referred to Judge Ira De Ment
05/30/1997
Stamped ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time for Dispositive Motions to 7/2l/97 (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
06/12/1997
MOTION by Outback Steakhouse for Summary Judgment (Affidavit of Joseph L. Kadow attached) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
25
06/12/1997
MEMORANDUM by Outback Steakhouse in support of [24-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Outback Steakhouse referred to Judge Ira De Ment
26
06/16/1997
ORDER [24-1] motion for Summary Judgment by Outback Steakhouse set for submission on 6/30/97 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
27
06/19/1997
SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION by Outback Steakhouse in support of [24-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Ira De Ment
28
06/30/1997
BRIEF by Paula Melanie Robinson in opposition to [24-1] motion for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Ira De Ment
29
07/01/1997
NOTICE concerning settlement conference and mediation by Outback Steakhouse, Aussie Restaurant. Referred to Judge De Ment.
30
07/30/1997
MOTION by Paula Melanie Robinson to reschedule pretrial referred to Judge Ira De Ment
08/04/1997
Stamped ORDER denying [30-1] motion to reschedule pretrial (by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL. (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
08/04/1997
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 2:30 9/4/97 before Judge Ira De Ment ; Proposed Pretrial Order due 8/28/97 ; Jury Trial set for 10/6/97 before Judge Ira De Ment ; (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
32
08/13/1997
Witness list by Paula Melanie Robinson, referred to Judge DeMent.
09/04/1997
Pre-Trial Conference held before Judge Ira De Ment on 9/4/97 (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
09/05/1997
PRETRIAL ORDER set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury selection set for 10:00 10/6/97 Jury Trial set for 10/6/97 before Judge Ira De Ment ; proposed jury instructions due on 9/29/97 trial brief deadline on 9/29/97 voir dire questions due 9/29/97 (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL, MT, CAC.
34
09/08/1997
ORDER, set Settlement (Mediation) Conference for 10:00 9/22/97 ; that counsel and the parties or a representative with full authority to settle the case shall appear at and attend this conference; that each party shall provide the undersigned judge with a confidential mediation confernece statement by 9/l9/97 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to CA, MT.
35
09/15/1997
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel
36
09/15/1997
JUDGMENT for Outback Steakhouse against Paula Melanie Robinson; that each party bear own costs (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel.
37
09/18/1997
MOTION by Aussie Restaurant for Leave to File Rule 4l2 Motion Under Seal (Sealed Envelope attached) referred to Judge Ira De Ment
38
09/18/1997
SEALED DOCUMENT
39
09/18/1997
SEALED DOCUMENT
40
09/22/1997
ORDER, set Evidentiary Hearing on Rule 4l2(c) Sealed Motion for 1:30 9/29/97 before Judge Ira De Ment granting [37-1] motion for Leave to File Rule 4l2 Motion Under Seal (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
09/22/1997
Settlement Conference held before Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/22/97 (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
09/23/1997
ORDER, set Advise Court of Settlement deadline to 10/14/97 (signed by Mag. Judge Charles S. Coody), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL, MT, CA.
42
10/14/1997
STIPULATION of dismissal, referred to Judge DeMent
43
10/20/1997
ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice, with each party to bear his, her or its own costs (signed by Judge Ira De Ment), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to RL.
10/20/1997
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.