Roderick Maurice Bradley and Jasmine Bradley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-04751 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 128 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/03/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Roderick Maurice Bradley, Jasmine Bradley
2
11/03/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.
3
11/03/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley
5
11/03/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.
6
11/03/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.
7
11/03/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.
8
11/03/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/23/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/02/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/12/2018.
9
11/04/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
11/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/05/2017.
11
11/04/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
12
11/06/2017
Amended Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley
13
11/06/2017
Order Approving Amended Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 12 Amended Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley, Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley).
14
11/08/2017
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed) with Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Alabama Housing Finance Authority.
15
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley, Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
16
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
17
11/13/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
18
11/29/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Charles N Parnell Filed by Creditor First Citizens Bank.
19
12/14/2017
*ENTERED IN ERROR* Meeting of Creditors Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc) Modified on 12/14/2017
20
12/14/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY incorrect date Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 19 Meeting of Creditors Held). (Ch13troffice, bc)
21
12/14/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 12/13/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
22
12/20/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, km)
23
12/20/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 1/23/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
12/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/22/2017.
25
01/07/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 2016 Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.
26
01/07/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.).
27
01/14/2018
Amended Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual, Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley. Modified on 1/16/2018 as amended
28
01/23/2018
Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2 Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.
29
01/26/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 1/26/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 2/27/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
01/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/28/2018.
02/08/2018
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04751-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21700433. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
02/09/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 13 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
32
02/27/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/27/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation), 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing rescheduled 4/10/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
33
02/27/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley (RE: related document(s) 26 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.).).
34
03/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 03/01/2018.
35
03/25/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley (RE: related document(s) 33 Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley (RE: related document(s) 26 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley, Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley.).).).
36
04/25/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
37
04/30/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; The Trustee's objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 4/30/2018 (RE: related document(s) 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, 35 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Roderick Maurice Bradley, Joint Debtor Jasmine Bradley).
38
05/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 05/02/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.