Rodney L Lazenby and Nina P Lazenby
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81999 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
07/07/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
07/09/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
02/05/2019
Limit Notice
54
02/27/2019
Modification of Plan (All Chapters)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.