Roger Blaine Coffell, Jr. and Lorena Ann Coffell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00499 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
69
08/31/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
70
12/06/2018
Employ (CM41)
71
12/10/2018
Employ
72
12/14/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
73
12/14/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
74
04/09/2019
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
75
04/10/2019
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
76
04/10/2019
Certificate of Service
05/02/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
05/03/2019
Certificate of No Objection
78
05/16/2019
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.