Rogers et al v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00302 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/20/2018
Complaint
2
12/20/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/21/2018
Unissued Summons
12/21/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
03/04/2019
Certificate of Service
5
03/05/2019
Answer to Complaint
6
03/06/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
7
03/28/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
8
05/20/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.