Roketa Schnelle Parker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01527 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 231 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i)
doc
05/22/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
1
04/09/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Roketa Schnelle Parker
2
04/09/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker.
4
04/09/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker.
5
04/09/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker.
04/09/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01527-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21936481. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/09/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker.
7
04/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/18/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/09/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/16/2018.
8
04/10/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/10/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker Case Number 95-02414, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/26/1995, Standard Discharge on 09/20/2000; Case Number 13-02984, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 07/02/2013, Standard Discharge on 10/07/2013.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/11/2018.
10
04/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/12/2018.
11
04/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker). Notice Date 04/12/2018.
12
04/16/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
13
05/04/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor First Investors Servicing Corp. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker.).
14
05/04/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 13 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor First Investors Servicing Corp.). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
15
05/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/16/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)
doc
05/22/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i). (Ch13troffice, km)
17
05/22/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/24/2018.
19
06/01/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker.).
20
06/18/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mr. Math shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #13; Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Leonard Math, attorney for First Investors Servicing Corp.
21
06/29/2018
Amended Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
22
07/11/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan. The Trustees objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 7/11/2018 (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), 19 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Roketa Schnelle Parker).
23
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 22 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 07/13/2018.
28
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
34
03/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.